Global Patent Index - EP 2024609 A2

EP 2024609 A2 2009-02-18 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A POWER PLANT

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CONTROLLING A POWER PLANT

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR STEUERUNG EINES KRAFTWERKS BEI STILLSTAND

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE COMMANDE D'UNE CENTRALE ÉLECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 2024609 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07729348 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054905 W
  • EP 06011275 A
  • EP 07729348 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007137960A2] Disclosed is a method for improving the start-up behavior and the shutdown times of a power plant (2) comprising several components, i.e. a boiler (4), a steam turbine (6), and an optional gas turbine (8). In said method, the temperature of at least one part of one of the components (4, 6, 8) is controlled during a standstill of the power plant (2) by transferring heat with the aid of a fluid flow (11).

IPC 8 main group level (invention and additional information)

F01K (2009.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01K 13/006 (2013.01); F01D 25/10 (2013.01); F01D 25/12 (2013.01); F01K 23/101 (2013.01); F05D 2260/85 (2013.01); F05D 2260/94 (2013.01); F05D 2260/941 (2013.01); Y02E 20/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137960A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007137960 A2 20071206; WO 2007137960 A3 20090903; CN 101627185 A 20100113; EP 2024609 A2 20090218

INPADOC legal status


2011-03-16 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100921

2010-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100510

2009-10-07 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20090903

2009-09-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081104

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS