Global Patent Index - EP 2024613 A1

EP 2024613 A1 2009-02-18 - DEVICE FOR INFLUENCING AN EXHAUST GAS FLOW

Title (en)

DEVICE FOR INFLUENCING AN EXHAUST GAS FLOW

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG ZUR BEEINFLUSSUNG EINER ABGASSTRÖMUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF POUR INFLUENCER L'ECOULEMENT DE GAZ D'ECHAPPEMENT

Publication

EP 2024613 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07724235 A

Priority

  • EP 2007003296 W
  • EP 06009061 A
  • DE 102006034178 A
  • EP 07724235 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102006034176A1] Device for influencing an exhaust gas flow comprises a flap (28) and a section of a rotary shaft (30) lying next to the flap made from one piece. An independent claim is also included for a method for the production of the device. Preferred Features: The flap and the section of a rotary shaft lying next to the flap are made from a metal core surrounded by a ceramic. The flap and the section of a rotary shaft lying next to the flap have a hollow chamber structure.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/16 (2006.01); F01N 1/18 (2006.01); F01N 7/14 (2006.01); F01N 13/14 (2010.01); F02D 9/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F01N 1/165 (2013.01); F01N 1/168 (2013.01); F01N 1/18 (2013.01); F01N 13/14 (2013.01); F02D 9/04 (2013.01); F01N 9/00 (2013.01); F01N 13/16 (2013.01); F01N 2240/36 (2013.01); F01N 2260/02 (2013.01); F01N 2260/022 (2013.01); F01N 2260/024 (2013.01); F01N 2390/02 (2013.01); F01N 2560/08 (2013.01); F01N 2560/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007124852A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006034176 A1 20071108; CN 101484668 A 20090715; CN 101495723 A 20090729; DE 102006034177 A1 20071108; DE 102006034178 A1 20071108; DE 502007003865 D1 20100701; EP 2024613 A1 20090218; EP 2027370 A1 20090225; EP 2027370 B1 20100519; KR 20080113445 A 20081230; US 2009217668 A1 20090903; US 2010229543 A1 20100916; WO 2007124850 A1 20071108; WO 2007124852 A1 20071108

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-25 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111101

2011-05-11 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-06-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2009-04-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090305

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: VENGHAUS, HELMUT

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GNAUERT, UWE

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: KOHLRAUTZ, DANIEL

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: WENZEL, MICHAEL WOLFGANG

2009-03-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SIEBALD, HUBERTUS

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081202

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS