Global Patent Index - EP 2024626 A1

EP 2024626 A1 2009-02-18 - METHOD OF OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

METHOD OF OPERATING AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN EINER BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE POUR LE FONCTIONNEMENT D'UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 2024626 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07729226 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054778 W
  • DE 102006023693 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007135066A1] An internal combustion engine (10) comprises a plurality of cylinders (12a-12d). The fuel is introduced into their combustion chambers in a cylinder-specific manner. It is proposed that a desired fuel quantity (q<SUB>soll</SUB>) be varied in a cylinder-specific manner during a period (t<SUB>E</SUB>) in such a way that the average value formed over the period (t<SUB>E</SUB>) corresponds at least approximately to a normal desired fuel quantity (q<SUB>soll_norm</SUB>) which would have to be injected without said variation in order to bring about or maintain a desired operating state of the internal combustion engine (10).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/02 (2006.01); F02D 41/14 (2006.01); F02D 41/30 (2006.01); F02D 41/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02D 41/1408 (2013.01); F02D 41/025 (2013.01); F02D 41/3023 (2013.01); F02D 41/402 (2013.01); F02D 41/008 (2013.01); Y02T 10/26 (2013.01); Y02T 10/44 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007135066A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006023693 A1 20071122; DE 102006023693 B4 20170608; EP 2024626 A1 20090218; JP 2009537729 A 20091029; KR 20090017526 A 20090218; US 2009210133 A1 20090820; US 7904232 B2 20110308; WO 2007135066 A1 20071129

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130301

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-06-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Designated State(s): DE FR

2009-04-15 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090317

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081219

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS