Global Patent Index - EP 2024632 A2

EP 2024632 A2 2009-02-18 - AIR FILTER UNIT COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE MAIN AIR FILTER AND AN ADDITIONAL AIR FILTER

Title (en)

AIR FILTER UNIT COMPRISING AT LEAST ONE MAIN AIR FILTER AND AN ADDITIONAL AIR FILTER

Title (de)

LUFTFILTEREINHEIT MIT WENIGSTENS EINEM HAUPTLUFTFILTER UND EINEM ZUSATZLUFTFILTER

Title (fr)

ENSEMBLE FILTRE À AIR COMPRENANT AU MOINS UN FILTRE À AIR PRINCIPAL ET UN FILTRE À AIR SUPPLÉMENTAIRE

Publication

EP 2024632 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07728222 A

Priority

  • EP 2007053760 W
  • DE 102006025231 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007137911A2] The invention relates to an air filter unit (10) comprising at least one main air filter (1) and an additional air filter (2) which is connected to the main air filter (1) by means of an air line (3) and comprises at least one additional filter element. The additional filter element is formed, on the untreated air side of the main air filter (1), by an at least partially porous wall of the air line which is closed on the suction side. Conversely, when the additional filter element is applied to the treated air side, it is arranged inside the air line connected to the main air filter.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/04 (2013.01); B01D 46/0024 (2013.01); F02M 35/024 (2013.01); B01D 2267/40 (2013.01); B01D 2279/30 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137911A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007137911 A2 20071206; WO 2007137911 A3 20080228; CN 101454560 A 20090610; CN 101454560 B 20120425; DE 102006025231 A1 20080110; EP 2024632 A2 20090218; US 2010043638 A1 20100225; US 8206480 B2 20120626

INPADOC legal status


2017-10-18 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170427

2017-01-11 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20161216

2012-02-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20111230

2009-09-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081110

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS