Global Patent Index - EP 2024649 A1

EP 2024649 A1 2009-02-18 - BLOCK ASSEMBLY FOR PNEUMATIC DISTRIBUTORS

Title (en)

BLOCK ASSEMBLY FOR PNEUMATIC DISTRIBUTORS

Title (de)

BLOCKANORDNUNG FÜR DRUCKLUFTVERTEILER

Title (fr)

ILOT POUR DISTRIBUTEURS PNEUMATIQUES

Publication

EP 2024649 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 07765941 A

Priority

  • FR 2007000864 W
  • FR 0604931 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007141403A1] The present invention relates to a block assembly (15) for pneumatic distributors (1) comprising a base (16) intended to receive a plurality of pneumatic distributors, possessing for this purpose at least one supply duct which can be connected to a supply inlet of each distributor and at least one exhaust duct which can be connected to each exhaust outlet of each distributor, and additionally having, for each control outlet of each distributor, at least one corresponding outlet channel intended to be connected to a pneumatic actuator, said base being designed such that the pneumatic distributors can be arranged on either side of a longitudinal central axis (A) of said base in at least two substantially parallel rows, characterized in that the base is also designed to equally receive pneumatic distributors of different types.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F15B 13/0814 (2013.01); F15B 13/085 (2013.01); F15B 13/0867 (2013.01); F15B 13/0875 (2013.01); Y10T 137/87249 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007141403A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

FR 2901851 A1 20071207; FR 2901851 B1 20101119; EP 2024649 A1 20090218; JP 2009539045 A 20091112; US 2011162739 A1 20110707; WO 2007141403 A1 20071213

INPADOC legal status


2016-10-19 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20160610

2016-06-10 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) DELETED

2009-07-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090528

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081021

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS