Global Patent Index - EP 2024666 A1

EP 2024666 A1 2009-02-18 - HYDROSTATIC DRIVE WITH AN OPEN HYDRAULIC CIRCUIT AND A CLOSED HYDRAULIC CIRCUIT

Title (en)

HYDROSTATIC DRIVE WITH AN OPEN HYDRAULIC CIRCUIT AND A CLOSED HYDRAULIC CIRCUIT

Title (de)

HYDROSTATISCHER ANTRIEB MIT EINEM OFFENEN HYDRAULISCHEN KREISLAUF UND EINEM GESCHLOSSENEN HYDRAULLISCHEN KREISLAUF

Title (fr)

MECANISME D'ENTRAINEMENT HYDROSTATIQUE COMPRENANT UN CIRCUIT HYDRAULIQUE OUVERT ET UN CIRCUIT HYDRAULIQUE FERME

Publication

EP 2024666 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07725764 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004884 W
  • DE 102006025985 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007140945A1] The invention relates to a hydrostatic drive with an open hydraulic circuit (2) and a closed hydraulic circuit (3). At least one hydraulic load (20, 21) of a working hydraulic system (18) is arranged in the open hydraulic circuit (2). The closed hydraulic circuit (3) comprises at least one working circuit (37) and one travel circuit (36), wherein at least one further hydraulic load (23) is arranged in the working circuit (37).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F16H 61/4078 (2010.01); F16H 61/4148 (2010.01); F16H 61/42 (2010.01); F16H 61/421 (2010.01); F16H 61/431 (2010.01); F16H 61/444 (2010.01); F16H 61/448 (2010.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16H 61/4078 (2013.01); F16H 61/4148 (2013.01); F16H 61/421 (2013.01); B60Y 2200/41 (2013.01); F16H 61/431 (2013.01); F16H 61/444 (2013.01); F16H 61/448 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007140945A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006025985 A1 20071206; CA 2625203 A1 20071213; EP 2024666 A1 20090218; WO 2007140945 A1 20071213

INPADOC legal status


2011-11-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110607

2011-02-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F16H 61/4078 20100101AFI20101214BHEP

2011-01-19 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: F16H 61/4148 20100101ALI20101214BHEP

2010-04-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100319

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: TIKKANEN, SEPPO

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080228

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS