Global Patent Index - EP 2024691 A1

EP 2024691 A1 2009-02-18 - SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REDUCING WINDAGE LOSSES IN COMPRESSOR MOTORS

Title (en)

SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR REDUCING WINDAGE LOSSES IN COMPRESSOR MOTORS

Title (de)

SYSTEM UND VERFAHREN ZUR VERRINGERUNG VON LÜFTUNGSVERLUSTEN IN VERDICHTERMOTOREN

Title (fr)

SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE RÉDUCTION DES PERTES DE TOURBILLONNEMENT DANS LES MOTEURS À COMPRESSEUR

Publication

EP 2024691 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07794855 A

Priority

  • US 2007011568 W
  • US 41986206 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2007271956A1] A method and system for reducing windage losses in compressor motors is provided. The compressor motor is cooled by circulating refrigerant from a closed refrigerant loop incorporating the compressor. A pumping device coupled to a liquid expander in the closed refrigerant loop circulates refrigerant through the motor cavity and produces a motor cavity pressure lower than evaporating pressure. The lower pressure in the motor cavity reduces the density of the gasses in the motor cavity, resulting in reduced windage losses of the motor. Additionally, the pumping device is powered by the recovered liquid expansion energy between the condenser and the evaporator.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25B 11/04 (2006.01); F25B 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25B 31/006 (2013.01); F04D 13/04 (2013.01); F04D 25/06 (2013.01); F04D 29/5806 (2013.01); F25B 11/04 (2013.01); F25B 2400/14 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007139692A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

US 2007271956 A1 20071129; CN 101473174 A 20090701; EP 2024691 A1 20090218; JP 2009538398 A 20091105; KR 20090016583 A 20090216; TW 200819692 A 20080501; WO 2007139692 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2011-08-10 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-02-28 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2009-12-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091119

2009-08-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-08-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-03-04 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081212

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS