Global Patent Index - EP 2024695 A1

EP 2024695 A1 2009-02-18 - ELECTRIC REFRIGERATOR COMPRISING A VACUUM-SEALED SYSTEM

Title (en)

ELECTRIC REFRIGERATOR COMPRISING A VACUUM-SEALED SYSTEM

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHER KÜHLSCHRANK MIT VAKUUM-FRISCHHALTESYSTEM

Title (fr)

RÉFRIGÉRATEUR ÉLECTRIQUE À SYSTÈME DE CONSERVATION SOUS VIDE

Publication

EP 2024695 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07729194 A

Priority

  • EP 2007054746 W
  • CN 200620071501 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007135048A1] The invention relates to an electric refrigerator comprising a vacuum-sealed system provided with at least one vacuum-sealed chamber (7) equipped with an air supply device (8) and an air discharge device (3). Said vacuum-sealed system also comprises at least one discharge line (3) which is connected to the vacuum-sealed chamber, a vacuum pump (1) connected to the discharge line, and an electric motor (2) for driving the vacuum pump. The inventive vacuum-sealed system further comprises a control device which controls the opening and closing of the discharge line (3) so that the system can be opened and closed selectively.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F25D 17/042 (2013.01); F25D 2317/043 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007135048A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007135048 A1 20071129; CN 2901196 Y 20070516; EP 2024695 A1 20090218; RU 2008148161 A 20100627; RU 2427768 C2 20110827

INPADOC legal status


2016-02-10 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150826

2015-05-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20150415

2015-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081219

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS