Global Patent Index - EP 2024744 A1

EP 2024744 A1 2009-02-18 - MICROTITER PLATE AND USE THEREOF

Title (en)

MICROTITER PLATE AND USE THEREOF

Title (de)

MIKROTITERPLATTE UND DEREN VERWENDUNG

Title (fr)

PLAQUE MICROTITRE ET SON UTILISATION

Publication

EP 2024744 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07725400 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004493 W
  • DE 102006025011 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102006025011A1] The microtiter plate (1) for fermentation with targeted feeding of nutrients into the culture fluid of cavities, comprises cavities (2, 3) having an opening at an upper side, and a base plate (5) and a cavity plate (6) with passages (7) between oppositely lying upper surfaces. Each cavity is connected by a channel (4) with a further cavity of the microtiter plate and in each channel a diffusion barrier is arranged. The channel of the cavities flows into a cavity. Each three adjacent cavities are connected together by the channels. Two channels flows into one of the three cavities. The microtiter plate (1) for fermentation with targeted feeding of nutrients into the culture fluid of cavities, comprises cavities (2, 3) having an opening at an upper side, and a base plate (5) and a cavity plate (6) with passages (7) between oppositely lying upper surfaces. Each cavity is connected by a channel (4) with a further cavity of the microtiter plate and in each channel a diffusion barrier is arranged. The channel of the cavities flows into a cavity. Each three adjacent cavities are connected together by the channels. Two channels flows into one of the three cavities. Each cavity consists of a form that differs from the remaining cavity and/or a different filling volume. The channel flow is linear or curved between the cavities. The channels are partially filled with hydrogel as a diffusion barrier between the cavities. The base plate and the cavity plate are connected with each other in a liquid-tight manner and are brought into the surfaces of the base plate forming the base of the cavities in a groove-like recess. The microtiter plate is partially closed by an area between the passages of the cavity plate in a liquid-tight manner. The recesses are arranged into the base plate. An end of the each recess arranged below one of the passage extends into the cavity and decreases the depth of the expansion in the base plate from its extension. The base of the cavities and the base plate partially consist of transparent material. The microtiter plate is connected with a shaker.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G01N 33/50 (2006.01); B01L 3/00 (2006.01); C12M 1/36 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C12M 23/12 (2013.01); B01L 3/5025 (2013.01); C12M 23/16 (2013.01); B01L 3/5027 (2013.01); B01L 3/5085 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0681 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0829 (2013.01); B01L 2300/0867 (2013.01); B01L 2400/0472 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007137722A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006025011 A1 20071129; EP 2024744 A1 20090218; US 2009170183 A1 20090702; US 8268611 B2 20120918; WO 2007137722 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-13 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20141129

2013-09-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: M2P-LABS GMBH

2013-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: M2P-LABS GMBH

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-05-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20110411

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081117

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS