Global Patent Index - EP 2024800 A2

EP 2024800 A2 2009-02-18 - METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR ONLINE VIDEO-BASED PROPERTY COMMERCE

Title (en)

METHODS AND SYSTEMS FOR ONLINE VIDEO-BASED PROPERTY COMMERCE

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND SYSTEME FÜR ONLINE IMMOBILIENHANDEL AUF VIDEOBASIS

Title (fr)

PROCÉDÉS ET SYSTÈMES DE VENTES DE MARCHANDISES REPOSANT SUR LA VIDÉO EN LIGNE

Publication

EP 2024800 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07761972 A

Priority

  • US 2007068385 W
  • US 74664506 P
  • US 74476407 A
  • US 74472107 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007131230A2] Video data may be extremely useful in online property commerce. However, the current methods of handling this video data fail to provide users of the data with effective and convenient ways of consolidating footage from multiple videos or portions thereof and conveying their particular viewpoints and other property features. Among other things, embodiments of the invention address these failures by providing methods and systems for generating and handling montage video data. Also, the embodiments of the invention address these failures by providing methods and systems for better handling of video data for property marketing, reporting, and analysis.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30 (2006.01); G06F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 30/06 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007131230 A2 20071115; WO 2007131230 A3 20080807; CA 2651652 A1 20071115; CA 2651652 C 20151201; EP 2024800 A2 20090218; EP 2024800 A4 20130306

INPADOC legal status


2014-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20140130

2013-03-06 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20130201

2013-03-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 7/00 20060101ALI20130128BHEP

2013-03-06 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 17/30 20060101AFI20130128BHEP

2009-08-12 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-03-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 17/30 20060101AFI20090213BHEP

2009-03-25 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 7/00 20060101ALI20090213BHEP

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081205

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS