Global Patent Index - EP 2024812 A2

EP 2024812 A2 2009-02-18 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DATA STORAGE AND RETRIEVAL

Title (en)

SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR DATA STORAGE AND RETRIEVAL

Title (de)

SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUM SPEICHERN UND WIEDERAUFFINDEN VON DATEN

Title (fr)

SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR LE STOCKAGE ET L'EXTRACTION DE DONNÉES

Publication

EP 2024812 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07762161 A

Priority

  • US 2007068856 W
  • US 38348006 A
  • US 38347706 A
  • US 38347906 A
  • US 38347806 A
  • US 38347606 A
  • US 38348206 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134278A2] Systems and methods for storing and accessing data. A query language statement may reference a plurality of data sets and a plurality of algebraic relations between the data sets may be composed from the query language statement. The algebraic relations may be used to define new data sets and to optimize access to data sets. A store of algebraic relations may be accumulated over time. Alternative collections of algebraic relations may be generated and evaluated to determine an optimized collection of algebraic relations to use in calculating and providing a requested data set. The optimization may be performed using the algebraic relations rather than retrieving underlying data sets from storage. As a result, optimization may be performed at processor speeds to minimize the amount of time required for data to be retrieved from slower storage.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 7/00 (2006.01); G06F 17/30 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/30424 (2013.01); G06F 17/30404 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007134278 A2 20071122; WO 2007134278 A3 20080828; AU 2007249268 A1 20071122; CA 2652268 A1 20071122; EP 2024812 A2 20090218; EP 2024812 A4 20120418; JP 2009537906 A 20091029; JP 5113157 B2 20130109

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1127659

2014-05-21 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20131203

2012-05-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ALGEBRAIX DATA CORPORATION

2012-04-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20120319

2012-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 7/00 20060101AFI20120313BHEP

2012-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06F 17/30 20060101ALI20120313BHEP

2009-10-02 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1127659

2009-08-19 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081212

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS