Global Patent Index - EP 2024856 A2

EP 2024856 A2 2009-02-18 - END USER TRANSPARENT EMAIL ATTACHMENT HANDLING TO OVERCOME SIZE AND ATTACHMENT POLICY BARRIERS

Title (en)

END USER TRANSPARENT EMAIL ATTACHMENT HANDLING TO OVERCOME SIZE AND ATTACHMENT POLICY BARRIERS

Title (de)

ENDBENUTZERSEITIGE TRANSPARENTE HANDHABUNG VON E-MAIL-ANHÄNGEN ZUR ÜBERWINDUNG VON GRÖSSEN- UND ANHANGSBESCHRÄNKUNGEN

Title (fr)

TRAITEMENT TRANSPARENT DE PIÈCES JOINTES À UN MESSAGE ÉLECTRONIQUE D'UN UTILISATEUR TERMINAL POUR SURMONTER DES BARRIÈRES DE TAILLE ET DE POLITIQUE DE PIÈCES JOINTES

Publication

EP 2024856 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07794626 A

Priority

  • US 2007011029 W
  • US 79833206 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007133504A2] Email server side or client side components either remove email attachments from the relevant email, or identify the attachment while the email is being composed and makes the attachment available from a secure website or file hosting site. The recipient then receives instructions in the email and links to access the attachments rather than the attachments themselves. Email attachment size limitations are overcome for sender/recipient mail systems. Also, file type limitations related to email attachments are overcome, provides improved attachment security, and reduces email bandwidth costs.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2012.01); H04L 12/58 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/107 (2013.01); H04L 51/08 (2013.01); H04L 51/18 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007133504 A2 20071122; WO 2007133504 A3 20080925; EP 2024856 A2 20090218; EP 2024856 A4 20120502

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20141202

2013-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20121212

2012-05-02 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20120404

2012-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06Q 10/00 20120101AFI20120329BHEP

2012-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: H04L 12/58 20060101ALN20120329BHEP

2009-09-02 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090325

2009-05-06 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS