Global Patent Index - EP 2024872 A2

EP 2024872 A2 2009-02-18 - SYSTEM, METHOD AND TECHNIQUE FOR ENABLING USERS TO INTERACT AND EDIT ADDRESS FIELDS OF MESSAGING APPLICATIONS

Title (en)

SYSTEM, METHOD AND TECHNIQUE FOR ENABLING USERS TO INTERACT AND EDIT ADDRESS FIELDS OF MESSAGING APPLICATIONS

Title (de)

SYSTEM, VERFAHREN UND TECHNIK ZUR BEFÄHIGUNG VON BENUTZERN FÜR DIE INTERAKTION UND BEARBEITUNG VON ADRESSFELDERN VON NACHRICHTENÜBERMITTLUNGSANWENDUNGEN

Title (fr)

SYSTÈME, PROCÉDÉ ET TECHNIQUE PERMETTANT AUX UTILISATEURS D'INTERAGIR ET D'ÉDITER DES CHAMPS D'ADRESSES D'APPLICATIONS DE MESSAGERIE

Publication

EP 2024872 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07783746 A

Priority

  • US 2007068906 W
  • US 43450206 A
  • US 43450406 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007134302A2] An input is received for an address field of a message that is to be transmitted from a messaging application. A contact record is associated from the input with the message. A recipient address is selected from the identified contact record for use as an address field value. An input is detected from the user, and subsequently, the user is enabled to edit the address field value. In one embodiment, the user is enabled to edit the address field value by either allowing the user to select a new recipient address from the identified contact record, or by allowing the user to create an alternative recipient address that is not part of the contact record.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06F 17/20 (2006.01); G06F 3/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04M 1/72547 (2013.01); H04M 1/274508 (2013.01); H04M 1/274558 (2013.01); H04M 1/72552 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007134302 A2 20071122; WO 2007134302 A3 20081127; EP 2024872 A2 20090218; EP 2024872 A4 20110727

INPADOC legal status


2017-05-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20170413

2011-07-27 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20110629

2010-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: HEWLETT-PACKARD DEVELOPMENT COMPANY, L.P.

2010-12-29 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: DONALD, RICHARD J.

2009-11-04 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-03-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: HAITANI, ROBERT

2009-03-11 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KANSAL, SACHIN

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081211

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS