Global Patent Index - EP 2024897 A2

EP 2024897 A2 2009-02-18 - CONCEPT FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OR LOCATION OF A TRANSPONDER IN AN RFID SYSTEM

Title (en)

CONCEPT FOR DETERMINING THE POSITION OR LOCATION OF A TRANSPONDER IN AN RFID SYSTEM

Title (de)

KONZEPT ZUR POSITIONS- ODER LAGEBESTIMMUNG EINES TRANSPONDERS IN EINEM RFID -SYSTEM

Title (fr)

PRINCIPE DE DETERMINATION DE LA POSITION D`UN TRANSPONDEUR DANS UN SYSTEME RFID

Publication

EP 2024897 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07725861 A

Priority

  • EP 2007004999 W
  • DE 102006026495 A
  • US 42283106 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE102006026495A1] The method involves producing alternating magnetic field by a transmitter/receiver such as reader (100), and by a control signal of an antenna device (102). Mapping signals are determined in the reader, where the signals represent a measure of an inductive coupling between the antenna device and the reader and a transponder (110). The inductive coupling is assigned to the antenna device by a distance or orientation of the transponder. Field strength of the alternating magnetic field is varied by the control signal. An independent claim is also included for a computer program with a program code for performing a method of determining a position or location of a transponder by an inductive coupling in a radio system.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 7/00 (2006.01); G01V 15/00 (2006.01); G06K 19/07 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04B 5/02 (2013.01); G01B 7/003 (2013.01); G01V 15/00 (2013.01); G06K 7/0008 (2013.01); G06K 7/10128 (2013.01); H04B 17/27 (2013.01); H04B 5/0062 (2013.01); H04B 5/0068 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007140999A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006026495 A1 20071213; EP 2024897 A2 20090218; US 2007290846 A1 20071220; WO 2007140999 A2 20071213; WO 2007140999 A3 20080912

INPADOC legal status


2014-01-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130730

2013-04-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130318

2009-09-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-05-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SCHILLING, MEINHARD

2009-05-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: OEHLER, MARTIN

2009-05-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WISSENDHEIT, UWE

2009-05-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KUZNETSOVA, DINA

2009-05-27 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GERHAEUSER, HEINZ

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081203

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS