Global Patent Index - EP 2024906 A1

EP 2024906 A1 2009-02-18 - COMBINER FOR IMPROVING HANDWRITING RECOGNITION

Title (en)

COMBINER FOR IMPROVING HANDWRITING RECOGNITION

Title (de)

KOMBINATOR ZUR VERBESSERTEN HANDSCHRIFTENERKENNUNG

Title (fr)

COMBINEUR POUR AMÉLIORER LA RECONNAISSANCE DE L'ÉCRITURE

Publication

EP 2024906 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07776763 A

Priority

  • US 2007010872 W
  • US 44376206 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US2007280536A1] Various technologies and techniques are disclosed that improve handwriting recognition operations. Handwritten input is received in training mode and run through several base recognizers to generate several alternate lists. The alternate lists are unioned together into a combined alternate list. If the correct result is in the combined list, each correct/incorrect alternate pair is used to generate training patterns. The weights associated with the alternate pairs are stored. At runtime, the combined alternate list is generated just as training time. The trained comparator-net can be used to compare any two alternates in the combined list. A template matching base recognizer is used with one or more neural network base recognizers to improve recognition operations. The system provides comparator-net and reorder-net processes trained on print and cursive data, and ones that have been trained on cursive-only data. The respective comparator-net and reorder-net processes are used accordingly.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06K 9/18 (2006.01); G06K 9/62 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06K 9/00422 (2013.01); G06K 9/6256 (2013.01); G06K 9/6292 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

US 2007280536 A1 20071206; US 7817857 B2 20101019; CN 101460960 A 20090617; CN 101460960 B 20130619; EP 2024906 A1 20090218; EP 2024906 A4 20110413; JP 2009539181 A 20091112; KR 20090024127 A 20090306; RU 2008147115 A 20100610; US 2011007963 A1 20110113; US 8326040 B2 20121204; WO 2007142770 A1 20071213

INPADOC legal status


2012-10-24 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120918

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2011-04-13 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20110314

2011-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06K 9/18 20060101AFI20080220BHEP

2011-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G06K 9/62 20060101ALI20110304BHEP

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ZHANG, QIC/O MICROSOFT CORPORATION

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: ABDULKADER, AHMAD A.C/O MICROSOFT CORPORATION

2009-04-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BLACK, MICHAEL T.

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080926

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS