Global Patent Index - EP 2024915 A2

EP 2024915 A2 2009-02-18 - EXTRACTION OF ATTRIBUTES AND VALUES FROM NATURAL LANGUAGE DOCUMENTS

Title (en)

EXTRACTION OF ATTRIBUTES AND VALUES FROM NATURAL LANGUAGE DOCUMENTS

Title (de)

EXTRAHIERUNG VON ATTRIBUTEN UND WERTEN AUS DOKUMENTEN IN NATÜRLICHER SPRACHE

Title (fr)

EXTRACTION D'ATTRIBUTS ET VALEURS DE DOCUMENTS EN LANGAGE NATUREL

Publication

EP 2024915 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07812022 A

Priority

  • US 2007070427 W
  • US 80394006 P
  • US 74221507 A
  • US 74224407 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007143658A2] One or more classification algorithms are applied to at least one natural language document in order to extract both attributes and values of a given product. Supervised classification algorithms, semi-supervised classification algorithms, unsupervised classification algorithms or combinations of such classification algorithms may be employed for this purpose. The at least one natural language document may be obtained via a public communication network. Two or more attributes (or two or more values) thus identified may be merged to form one or more attribute phrases or value phrases. Once attributes and values have been extracted in this manner, association or linking operations may be performed to establish attribute -value pairs that are descriptive of the product. In a presently preferred embodiment, an (unsupervised) algorithm is used to generate seed attributes and values which can then support a supervised or semi-supervised classification algorithm.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2013.01); G06F 17/2745 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007143658A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007143658 A2 20071213; WO 2007143658 A3 20080424; WO 2007143658 A9 20080207; EP 2024915 A2 20090218

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-27 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20151105

2015-11-05 [REG DE R003] REFUSAL DECISION NOW FINAL

2012-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20120202

2011-04-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ACCENTURE GLOBAL SERVICES LIMITED

2009-09-09 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: FANO, ANDREW E.

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: PROBST, KATHARINA

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GHANI, RAYID

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: KREMA, MARKO

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LIU, YAN

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081218

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS