Global Patent Index - EP 2024922 A2

EP 2024922 A2 2009-02-18 - DRAG-AND-DROP GRAPHICAL CONTROL INTERFACE FOR ALGORITHMIC TRADING ENGINE

Title (en)

DRAG-AND-DROP GRAPHICAL CONTROL INTERFACE FOR ALGORITHMIC TRADING ENGINE

Title (de)

UMFANGREICHE GRAFISCHE BENUTZERSCHNITTSTELLE FÜR ALGORITHMISCHES HANDELSSYSTEM

Title (fr)

INTERFACE DE COMMANDE GRAPHIQUE RICHE POUR MOTEUR D'ÉCHANGE ALGORITHMIQUE

Publication

EP 2024922 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07761366 A

Priority

  • US 2007067528 W
  • US 79564606 P
  • US 78325107 A
  • US 78325407 A
  • US 78325007 A
  • US 78325307 A
  • US 78325207 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007127857A2] A graphical user interface is used along with an automated algorithm selection function to enable market participants to initiate automated, multi-algorithm trading strategies through a single drag and drop motion. A symbol representing a security can be dragged and dropped onto an icon representing a tactical or strategic algorithm. Other features of the graphical user interface show information such as the progress of the algorithms.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 40/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 40/04 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007127857 A2 20071108; WO 2007127857 A3 20080626; WO 2007127857 B1 20080814; AU 2007244791 A1 20071108; AU 2007244791 A2 20090108; AU 2007244791 B2 20110929; AU 2008249190 A1 20081218; AU 2008249190 B2 20110929; AU 2008249191 A1 20081218; AU 2008249191 B2 20110922; AU 2008249192 A1 20081218; AU 2008249192 B2 20110929; CA 2671125 A1 20071108; CA 2675640 A1 20071108; CA 2675653 A1 20071108; CA 2675658 A1 20071108; CA 2675663 A1 20071108; EP 2024922 A2 20090218; EP 2024922 A4 20090722; EP 2081145 A1 20090722; EP 2081146 A1 20090722; EP 2081147 A1 20090722; EP 2083387 A1 20090729; JP 2009187569 A 20090820; JP 2009187570 A 20090820; JP 2009187571 A 20090820; JP 2009187572 A 20090820; JP 2009535713 A 20091001; SG 161288 A1 20100527; SG 161289 A1 20100527; TW 200816073 A 20080401

INPADOC legal status


2015-11-20 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1127146

2012-04-25 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111031

2010-07-14 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: DRAG-AND-DROP GRAPHICAL CONTROL INTERFACE FOR ALGORITHMIC TRADING ENGINE

2009-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-09-18 [REG HK DE] REQUESTS TO DESIGNATE PATENT IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1127146

2009-08-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WAELBROECK, HENRI

2009-08-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GAMSE, BRENT

2009-08-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DEMPSEY, IAN

2009-08-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHAPIRO, ANDREW

2009-08-19 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BURMEISTER, ABE

2009-08-05 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-22 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20090619

2009-04-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: PIPELINE FINANCIAL GROUP, INC.

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: WAELBROECK, HENRI

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: GAMSE, BRENT

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: DEMPSEY, IAN

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: SHAPIRO, ANDREW

2009-03-25 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: BURMEISTER, ABE

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081128

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS