Global Patent Index - EP 2024925 A2

EP 2024925 A2 2009-02-18 - SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR OBTAINING, STORING, PROCESSING AND UTILIZING IMMUNOLOGIC AND OTHER INFORMATION OF AN INDIVIDUAL OR POPULATION

Title (en)

SYSTEMS AND METHODS FOR OBTAINING, STORING, PROCESSING AND UTILIZING IMMUNOLOGIC AND OTHER INFORMATION OF AN INDIVIDUAL OR POPULATION

Title (de)

SYSTEME UND VERFAHREN ZUR GEWINNUNG, SPEICHERUNG, VERARBEITUNG UND VERWENDUNG IMMUNOLOGISCHER UND ANDERER INFORMATIONEN EINES INDIVIDUUMS ODER EINER POPULATION

Title (fr)

SYSTÈMES ET PROCÉDÉS POUR L'OBTENTION, LE STOCKAGE, LE TRAITEMENT ET L'UTILISATION D'INFORMATIONS IMMUNOLOGIQUES ET AUTRES CONCERNANT UN INDIVIDU OU UNE POPULATION

Publication

EP 2024925 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07794466 A

Priority

  • US 2007010576 W
  • US 79626606 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007127490A2] A system and method for assessing the immunological status of one or more individuals in a patient population is presented. The method includes establishing a database comprising a plurality of records of information each representative of the immune status of an individual in the population, each of said records including (1) current information from one or more assays for the presence of a biochemical, and (2) individual specific information comprising one or more of said individual's medical history, said individual's doctors' observations and historical, demographic, lifestyle, and familial information relating to said individual. The method further includes processing the information in said database to find trends or patterns relating to the. immune status of individuals in said patient population; and using the said trends or patterns as part of a health care related decision making process. In exemplary embodiments of the present invention, processing the information in the database includes generating a list of correlations between variables or fields in the database, and for each correlation in the list generating a set of hypotheses that may explain said correlation. In exemplary embodiments of the present invention, as to each hypothesis in the set, automatically refuting, supporting or stating that there is insufficient data to analyze said hypothesis by further processing of the database; and reporting the correlations, their associated hypotheses and the refutation, support, or determination of insufficient data to refute or support, to a user.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2012.01); G06Q 50/00 (2012.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G06Q 10/00 (2013.01); G06F 19/18 (2013.01); G06F 19/24 (2013.01); G06Q 50/22 (2013.01); Y02A 90/22 (2018.01); Y02A 90/24 (2018.01); Y02A 90/26 (2018.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007127490 A2 20071108; WO 2007127490 A3 20081016; CA 2650584 A1 20071108; EP 2024925 A2 20090218; EP 2024925 A4 20101222

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20170324

2010-12-22 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20101123

2010-09-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: WELLSTAT VACCINES, LLC

2009-09-23 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081125

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS