Global Patent Index - EP 2024944 A2

EP 2024944 A2 2009-02-18 - VENDING APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING DRINKS THAT CONTAIN FRUITS OR VEGETABLES

Title (en)

VENDING APPARATUS FOR DISPENSING DRINKS THAT CONTAIN FRUITS OR VEGETABLES

Title (de)

VERKAUFSAPPARAT ZUR AUSGABE VON GETRÄNKEN, DIE FRÜCHTE ODER GEMÜSE ENTHALTEN

Title (fr)

DISTRIBUTEUR DE BOISSONS AUX FRUITS ET AUX LÉGUMES

Publication

EP 2024944 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07706120 A

Priority

  • IL 2007000177 W
  • US 77185706 P
  • US 81116606 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007091265A2] A vending machine for dispensing drinks which include fruits and vegetables that are cut into very small particles. The drink can be milk based, orange juice based or based on any other liquid drinks. The machine comprises a housing containing a plurality of compartments for holding one or more produce or produce pieces and one or more kinds of drinkable liquids; a mechanism for cutting and/or crushing the produce or produce pieces; a mechanism for dispensing a cup; a compartment where the user can pick up the filled cup with selected drink; and a controller for automatically initiate the drink preparation in response to a customer's selection.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A23L 1/00 (2006.01); A23N 1/00 (2006.01); G07F 13/06 (2006.01); G07F 13/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 13/065 (2013.01); A23C 9/156 (2013.01); A23C 9/1565 (2013.01); A23L 2/02 (2013.01); A23N 1/02 (2013.01); G07F 13/10 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

WO 2007091265 A2 20070816; WO 2007091265 A3 20090416; EP 2024944 A2 20090218; EP 2024944 A4 20101222

INPADOC legal status


2011-04-20 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110316

2010-12-22 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20101124

2010-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23L 1/00 20060101AFI20090511BHEP

2010-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07F 13/06 20060101ALI20101118BHEP

2010-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: G07F 13/10 20060101ALI20101118BHEP

2010-12-22 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23N 1/00 20060101ALI20101118BHEP

2009-06-17 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A23L 1/00 20060101AFI20090511BHEP

2009-05-20 [R17D] SEARCH REPORT (CORRECTION)

- Effective date: 20090416

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080910

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR