Global Patent Index - EP 2024989 A2

EP 2024989 A2 2009-02-18 - HIGH-PRESSURE DISCHARGE LAMP WITH AN IMPROVED STARTING CAPABILITY, AS WELL AS A HIGH-VOLTAGE PULSE GENERATOR

Title (en)

HIGH-PRESSURE DISCHARGE LAMP WITH AN IMPROVED STARTING CAPABILITY, AS WELL AS A HIGH-VOLTAGE PULSE GENERATOR

Title (de)

HOCHDRUCKENTLADUNGSLAMPE MIT VERBESSERTER ZÜNDFÄHIGKEIT SOWIE HOCHSPANNUNGSPULSGENERATOR

Title (fr)

LAMPE À DÉCHARGE À HAUTE PRESSION À CAPACITÉ D'ALLUMAGE AMÉLIORÉE ET GÉNÉRATEUR D'IMPULSIONS DE HAUTE TENSION

Publication

EP 2024989 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 07729855 A

Priority

  • EP 2007055467 W
  • DE 102006026750 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007141240A2] A spiral pulse generator is used to start the high-pressure discharge lamp, and is accommodated directly in the outer bulb of the lamp. The spiral pulse generator is surrounded by a ferritic material so that it acts as a starting transformer.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/54 (2006.01); H05B 41/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01J 61/54 (2013.01); H01J 61/547 (2013.01); H05B 41/04 (2013.01); H03K 3/53 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007141240A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006026750 A1 20071213; CN 101467230 A 20090624; CN 101467230 B 20110309; EP 2024989 A2 20090218; JP 2009540491 A 20091119; US 2009091259 A1 20090409; WO 2007141240 A2 20071213; WO 2007141240 A3 20080904; WO 2007141286 A2 20071213; WO 2007141286 A3 20080731

INPADOC legal status


2013-07-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130103

2013-04-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: OSRAM GMBH

2010-07-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100621

2009-09-16 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081112

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR