Global Patent Index - EP 2025052 A1

EP 2025052 A1 2009-02-18 - INVERTER CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE INVERTER CIRCUIT

Title (en)

INVERTER CIRCUIT AND METHOD FOR OPERATING THE INVERTER CIRCUIT

Title (de)

WECHSELRICHTERSCHALTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM BETREIBEN DER WECHSELRICHTERSCHALTUNG

Title (fr)

ONDULEUR ET PROCÉDÉ D'EXPLOITATION DE L'ONDULEUR

Publication

EP 2025052 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07728203 A

Priority

  • EP 2007053740 W
  • DE 102006025975 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO2007141078A1] The invention relates to an inverter circuit having a primary circuit and a secondary circuit which are galvanically isolated by means of a transformer (T) with the primary circuit having means for clocked connection of a primary winding (N<SUB>P</SUB>) to a DC voltage (V<SUB>IN</SUB>) which is applied to the input of the inverter circuit, and with the secondary circuit having means for connection of a secondary winding (N<SUB>S</SUB>) to an AC voltage (V<SUB>MAINS</SUB>) which is produced at the output of the inverter circuit, with the primary circuit furthermore being connected by means of a first inductor (L<SUB>P</SUB>) to the DC voltage (V<SUB>IN</SUB>), and with the secondary winding (NS) being connected to the AC voltage (V<SUB>MAINS</SUB>) by means of a second inductor (L<SUB>S</SUB>) in series with a first capacitor (C<SUB>S</SUB>), via a full bridge which is formed from four switching elements (S1, S2, S3, S4).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H02M 7/48 (2007.01); H02M 7/538 (2007.01); H02M 7/797 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H02M 7/4807 (2013.01); H02M 7/53806 (2013.01); H02M 7/5395 (2013.01); H02M 7/797 (2013.01); H02M 3/005 (2013.01); H02M 2001/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 2007141078A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102006025975 A1 20071206; DE 102006025975 B4 20080828; CN 101461125 A 20090617; CN 101461125 B 20110914; EP 2025052 A1 20090218; JP 2009539337 A 20091112; KR 20090018705 A 20090220; US 2009251938 A1 20091008; US 8027179 B2 20110927; WO 2007141078 A1 20071213

INPADOC legal status


2017-09-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20170420

2017-08-30 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2017-01-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20161209

2013-03-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2012-08-08 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2010-04-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081010

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS