Global Patent Index - EP 2025252 A2

EP 2025252 A2 2009-02-18 - Item of clothing

Title (en)

Item of clothing

Title (de)

Bekleidungsstück

Title (fr)

Pièce de vêtement

Publication

EP 2025252 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08008656 A

Priority

DE 102007037968 A

Abstract (en)

A seam (4) joins together a banner (3) and a part (2) to be worn on the body so as to be detachable. These are joined by a Velcrofastener or a zip fastener. They are also joined near the shoulders. The part to be worn on the body is like a T-shirt, a top, a short-sleeved shirt, a pullover, a sweatshirt or a jacket and overprinted and/or supplied with emblems.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Bekleidungsstück (1), umfassend ein am Körper zu tragendes Teil (2) und eine Fahne (3), die an dem am Körper zu tragenden Teil (2) befestigt ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 1/00 (2006.01); A41D 15/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 1/04 (2013.01); A41D 15/00 (2013.01); G09F 17/00 (2013.01); G09F 21/02 (2013.01); G09F 7/12 (2013.01); G09F 2021/023 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025252 A2 20090218; EP 2025252 A3 20100901; DE 102007037968 A1 20090212

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-21 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20110510

2011-06-08 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20101201

2011-05-04 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2010-09-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-09-01 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS