Global Patent Index - EP 2025253 A2

EP 2025253 A2 2009-02-18 - Protective clothing with a mounting device

Title (en)

Protective clothing with a mounting device

Title (de)

Schutzbekleidung mit einem Befestigungsmittel

Title (fr)

Habillage de protection doté d'un moyen de fixation

Publication

EP 2025253 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08013920 A

Priority

DE 102007038224 A

Abstract (en)

The protective clothing has a metal mesh (20) and has a band-shaped fastener (10) for the attachment of the protective clothing at the body of the user. A fixing unit (12) is assigned to the band-shaped fastener for fixing the fastener. A receiving channel is provided which has a buttonhole (15). A part of the fixing unit is detachably through-buttoned and another associated part of the fixing unit is fixed at the former through-buttoned part.

Abstract (de)

Eine zumindest teilweise aus einem Metallringgeflecht bestehende Schutzbekleidung weist wenigstens ein bandförmiges, zumindest teilweise in einen Aufnahmekanal (11) aufgenommenes und mit dem Metallringgeflecht (20) verbundenes Befestigungsmittel (10) zur Befestigung der Schutzbekleidung am Körper des Benutzers auf. Das Befestigungsmittel (10) umfasst eine Fixiereinrichtung (12) mit einem ersten Teil und einem damit bedarfsweise verbindbaren zweiten Teil. Dadurch, dass der Aufnahmenkanal (11) ein Knopfloch (15) aufweist, durch das das erste Teil der Befestigungseinrichtung (12) durchgeknöpft ist, und dadurch, dass das zugehörige zweite Teil der Fixiereinrichtung am ersten Teil befestigbar ist, wird eine langlebige Schutzbekleidung geschaffen (Fig. 6).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41D 19/015 (2006.01); A41F 1/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41D 19/01511 (2013.01); A41F 1/06 (2013.01); A41D 19/0048 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025253 A2 20090218; EP 2025253 A3 20160120; EP 2025253 B1 20170927; DE 102007038224 A1 20090226; DK 2025253 T3 20180102; ES 2649758 T3 20180115; PL 2025253 T3 20180330

INPADOC legal status


2018-05-31 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20180127

2018-05-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170927

2018-04-30 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170927

2018-04-04 [REG SK T3] TRANSLATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT SPECIFICATION INTO SLOVAKIAN

- Document: SK E 26060

2018-02-28 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171227

2018-02-28 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170927

2018-02-28 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171228

2018-02-12 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2018-01-31 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170927

2018-01-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170927

2018-01-31 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20171227

2018-01-31 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170927

2018-01-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20170927

2018-01-17 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2018-01-15 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2649758 T3

- Effective date: 20180115

2018-01-02 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Effective date: 20171221

2017-11-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MERVELIX SARL, CH

2017-11-09 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008015648

2017-10-18 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2017-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 931158 T

- Effective date: 20171015

2017-09-29 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2017-09-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2017-09-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2017-04-19 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20170322

2016-09-28 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2016-09-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: MK

2016-09-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: BA

2016-09-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: RS

2016-09-28 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Countries: AL

2016-09-14 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2016-08-31 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20160720

2016-08-31 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2016-01-20 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2016-01-20 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2016-01-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A41F 1/06 20060101ALI20151214BHEP

2016-01-20 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A41D 19/015 20060101AFI20151214BHEP

2014-11-19 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: ZIEGLER ARBEITSSCHUTZ GMBH

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS