Global Patent Index - EP 2025257 A2

EP 2025257 A2 2009-02-18 - Pocket tool and combination thereof with key

Title (en)

Pocket tool and combination thereof with key

Title (de)

Taschenwerkzeug und seine Kombination mit einem Schlüssel

Title (fr)

Outil de poche et sa combinaison avec une clé

Publication

EP 2025257 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08252701 A

Priority

GB 0716145 A

Abstract (en)

A pocket tool (1) is in the form of a channel-section which is arranged to fit over the shank of a key (k) and has an aperture (h1, h2) formed in the proximal ends of the side walls thereof which registers with the standard aperture formed in a key handle, enabling the tool to be linked to a key with a key ring (r). As shown, the key can be unfolded from the tool until the root of the key shank bears against the base of the channel, so that leverage can be applied to a bottle opener portion (4) as shown by the curved arrow. The tool is compact and lightweight and reduces wear to the user's pockets.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A44B 15/00 (2006.01); A45C 11/32 (2006.01); B25B 15/00 (2006.01); B25F 1/00 (2006.01); B67B 7/16 (2006.01); B67B 7/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A44B 15/005 (2013.01); A45C 11/321 (2013.01); A45C 11/324 (2013.01); B25F 1/00 (2013.01); B67B 7/16 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025257 A2 20090218; EP 2025257 A3 20100623; GB 0716145 D0 20070926; GB 2451905 A 20090218; GB 2451905 B 20090819

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-28 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130301

2012-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20121026

2011-03-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-11-24 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20101015

2010-08-18 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: TRUE BRANDS LIMITED

2010-06-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-06-23 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2010-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A44B 15/00 20060101AFI20081118BHEP

2010-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B67B 7/16 20060101ALI20100518BHEP

2010-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B67B 7/44 20060101ALI20100518BHEP

2010-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A45C 11/32 20060101ALI20100518BHEP

2010-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B25B 15/00 20060101ALI20100518BHEP

2010-06-23 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B25F 1/00 20060101ALI20100518BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS