Global Patent Index - EP 2025274 A1

EP 2025274 A1 2009-02-18 - Touchless optically controlled dispenser

Title (en)

Touchless optically controlled dispenser

Title (de)

Berührungsloser, optisch gesteuerter Spender

Title (fr)

Distributeur sans contact commandé optiquement

Publication

EP 2025274 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08014458 A

Priority

  • CA 2597190 A
  • CA 2633564 A

Abstract (en)

An automatically controlled apparatus (10) whose operation is controlled at least in part by the input of a signal that an object is sensed in a selected position relative the apparatus, the apparatus having an emitter (63) to emit electromagnetic radiation and a sensor (54) to sense electromagnetic radiation emitted by the emitter which is reflected off an object suitably positioned relative the apparatus, comprising a carriage member (220) mounted to the apparatus for relative pivoting about a pivot axis (234), the emitter (53) and sensor (54) carried by carriage member (220), the emitter (53) being generally directional emitting radiation to emanate outwardly from the emitter generally along a longitudinal emission axis, the sensor (54) being generally directional and sensing radiation which emanates generally along a longitudinal sensing axis terminating in the sensor, the emission axis and the sensing axis generally disposed in a common plane which includes the horizontal axis.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47K 5/1207 (2013.01); A47K 5/12 (2013.01); A47K 5/1217 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025274 A1 20090218; EP 2025274 B1 20120711

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170828

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-08-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-08-08 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602008017044

- Effective date: 20130412

2013-06-19 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130412

2012-09-06 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602008017044

- Effective date: 20120906

2012-07-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2012-07-11 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS