Global Patent Index - EP 2025276 A2

EP 2025276 A2 2009-02-18 - Vacuum cleaner with an attached filter bag and filter bag

Title (en)

Vacuum cleaner with an attached filter bag and filter bag

Title (de)

Staubsauger mit einem darin angeordneten Filterbeutel sowie Filterbeutel hierzu

Title (fr)

Aspirateur doté d'un sac filtrant installé à l'intérieur et sac filtrant correspondant

Publication

EP 2025276 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08159880 A

Priority

DE 102007036338 A

Abstract (en)

The vacuum cleaner contains a filter bag (4) having a holding plate (9) with an inflow aperture (10) with a connector (13) bounding a first pressure regions (P1). There is a first seal (17) between the holding plate and this connector. The holding plate is also sealed by a second seal (18) from a second pressure region (P2) formed by a partition wall (15) fixed to the housing.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft zunächst einen Staubsauger (1) mit einem darin angeordneten Filterbeutel (4), wobei der Filterbeutel (4) eine Halteplatte (9) mit einer Einströmöffnung (10) aufweist, welche Einströmöffnung (10) einem, einen ersten Druckbereich (P 1 ) begrenzenden Stutzen (13) zugeordnet ist, wobei zwischen der Halteplatte (9) und dem Stutzen (13) eine erste Dichtung (17) angeordnet ist. Um einen Staubsauger der in Rede stehenden Art insbesondere hinsichtlich der Dichtausgestaltung zwischen Stutzen und Halteplatte weiter zu verbessern, wird vorgeschlagen, dass die Halteplatte (9) mittels einer zweiten Dichtung (18) zu einem durch eine gehäusefeste Trennwand (15) gegebenen zweiten Druckbereich (P 2 ) hin abgedichtet ist. Weiter betrifft die Erfindung einen Filterbeutel (4) für einen Staubsauger (1), mit einer Halteplatte (9) und mit einer in der Halteplatte (9) vorgesehenen Einströmöffnung (10), weiter mit einer an der Halteplatte (9) befestigten Dichtung (17, 18) zur Zusammenwirkung mit einem staubsaugerseitigen Stutzen (13). Eine Verbesserung hinsichtlich der Abdichtung zwischen Halteplatte und staubsaugerseitigem Stutzen ist dadurch erreicht, dass die Dichtung (17,18) mit Bezug zu der Einströmöffnung (10) sich nach radial außen oder nach radial innen erweiternd ausgebildet ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47L 5/28 (2006.01); A47L 9/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47L 9/1436 (2013.01); A47L 5/28 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 0532057 A2 19930317 - VORWERK CO INTERHOLDING [DE]

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CZ DE ES FR IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025276 A2 20090218; EP 2025276 A3 20100505; EP 2025276 B1 20111026; AT 530098 T 20111115; CN 101357050 A 20090204; CN 101357050 B 20120516; DE 102007036338 A1 20090205; DE 202008018065 U1 20110829; EP 2364631 A1 20110914; EP 2364631 B1 20121128; ES 2373483 T3 20120203; ES 2396465 T3 20130221

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20170719

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170818

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-31 [PGFP CZ] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160527

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-07-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2012-11-29 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502008005349

- Effective date: 20120727

2012-10-03 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20120727

2012-02-03 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2373483 T3

- Effective date: 20120203

2011-12-22 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502008005349

- Effective date: 20111222

2011-10-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CZ DE ES FR IT

2011-08-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47L 5/28 20060101AFI20110707BHEP

2011-08-10 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: A47L 9/14 20060101ALI20110707BHEP

2011-01-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT CZ DE ES FR IT

2010-11-03 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20101005

2010-10-20 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100910

2010-05-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-05-05 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS