Global Patent Index - EP 2025361 A1

EP 2025361 A1 2009-02-18 - Tank filters adaptable for placement with a guide wire, in series with the lead wires or circuits of active medical devices to enhance MRI compatibility

Title (en)

Tank filters adaptable for placement with a guide wire, in series with the lead wires or circuits of active medical devices to enhance MRI compatibility

Title (de)

Notch-Filter zur Verbesserung von MRI-Kompatibilität, in Serienschaltung mit Elektrodenleitung oder Schaltkreisen von aktiven medizinischen Geräten und anpassbar zur Aufnahme eines Führungsdrahtes

Title (fr)

Filtres réjecteur adaptables pour la mise en place d'un guide-fil, en série avec les fils conducteurs ou circuits de dispositifs médicaux actifs pour améliorer la compatibilité de l'IRM

Publication

EP 2025361 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07021770 A

Priority

US 83803507 A

Abstract (en)

A tank filter is provided for a lead wire of an active medical device (AMD). The tank filter includes a capacitor in parallel with an inductor. The parallel capacitor and inductor are placed in series with the lead wire of the AMD, wherein values of capacitance and inductance are selected such that the tank filter is resonant at a selected frequency. A passageway through the tank filter permits selective slidable passage of a guide wire therethrough for locating the lead wire in an implantable position. The Q of the inductor may be relatively maximized and the Q of the capacitor may be relatively minimized to reduce the overall Q of the tank filter to attenuate current flow through the lead wire along a range of selected frequencies. In a preferred form, the tank filter is integrated into a TIP and/or RING electrode for an active implantable medical device.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/05 (2006.01); A61N 1/08 (2006.01); A61N 1/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61N 1/3754 (2013.01); A61N 1/05 (2013.01); A61N 1/086 (2017.08); A61N 1/3718 (2013.01); H03H 7/01 (2013.01); A61N 1/056 (2013.01); A61N 1/0565 (2013.01); A61N 1/0573 (2013.01); H01G 4/35 (2013.01); H01G 4/40 (2013.01); H03H 7/1766 (2013.01); H03H 7/1783 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

US 2008161886 A1 20080703; US 7702387 B2 20100420; CA 2601663 A1 20090213; CN 101366665 A 20090218; EP 2025361 A1 20090218; JP 2009045425 A 20090305

INPADOC legal status


2011-07-27 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110204

2010-10-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100923

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-07-29 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090618

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS