Global Patent Index - EP 2025422 A1

EP 2025422 A1 2009-02-18 - Thermostructural composite roller

Title (en)

Thermostructural composite roller

Title (de)

Thermostrukturelle Verbundwalze

Title (fr)

Rouleau composite thermostructural

Publication

EP 2025422 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 08159223 A

Priority

FR 0756793 A

Abstract (en)

The roller (100) has an axial support element i.e. mandrel (110), made of metallic material and including a cylindrical shell (120) that is made of thermostructural composite material i.e. carbon-carbon composite material. A mechanical coupling unit mechanically couples the shell with the element to compensate differential expansion between the element and the shell for avoiding deformation of the shell. The shell has a silicon carbide layer (122) that is formed below a chromium carbide layer (123). The shell has a series of teeth (1210, 1220) that is gripped with a set of splines (114).

Abstract (fr)

L'invention concerne un rouleau (100) comprenant un élément de support axial (110) en matériau métallique comprenant au moins deux arbres (111, 112) et une enveloppe cylindrique (120) en matériau composite thermostructural. Afin de compenser les dilatations différentielles entre l'élément de support axial en matériau métallique et l'enveloppe cylindrique en matériau composite thermostructural, un jeu radial est ménagé entre l'élément de support axial et l'enveloppe cylindrique.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21B 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21B 27/032 (2013.01); B65H 27/00 (2013.01); F16C 13/00 (2013.01); B21B 2003/001 (2013.01); B65H 2404/113 (2013.01); B65H 2404/13171 (2013.01); B65H 2404/1342 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025422 A1 20090218; EP 2025422 B1 20100217; CA 2638131 A1 20090130; CN 101358620 A 20090204; DE 602008000656 D1 20100401; ES 2339615 T3 20100521; FR 2919511 A1 20090206; FR 2919511 B1 20100129; KR 20090013053 A 20090204; RU 2008130906 A 20100210; US 2009036283 A1 20090205

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170628

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-06-28 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-06-10 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120628

2013-10-18 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20131018

2013-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120627

2013-04-18 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 602008000656

- Effective date: 20130101

2013-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20120627

2013-02-27 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20120627

2011-12-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20110630

- Year of fee payment: 4

2011-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20110606

- Year of fee payment: 4

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20110609

- Year of fee payment: 4

2011-01-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20101118

2010-05-21 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2339615 T3

2010-04-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602008000656 P 20100401

2010-02-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2010-02-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080627

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS