Global Patent Index - EP 2025426 A1

EP 2025426 A1 2009-02-18 - Production of a container by means of internal high pressure moulds and container produced thereby

Title (en)

Production of a container by means of internal high pressure moulds and container produced thereby

Title (de)

Herstellung eines Behälters mittels Innenhochdruckumformen und dadurch hergestellter Behälter

Title (fr)

Fabrication d'un récipient à l'aide de déformations internes à haute pression et récipient obtenu

Publication

EP 2025426 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08105054 A

Priority

DE 102007038823 A

Abstract (en)

A longitudinal completely seamless seam-welded aluminum tube (10) is inserted into a molding tool (12). A completely seamless aluminum tube can be used, e.g. if the tube has been extruded or cast from a molten mass of aluminum. The die (14) for the molding tool has a cylindrical shape, which it uses to define the shape of a pressure vessel/tank to be produced. An independent claim is also included for a pressure vessel/tank.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Behälters (6). Der vorliegenden Erfindung liegt die Aufgabe zu Grunde, ein verbessertes Verfahren zum Herstellen eines Behälters (6) vorzuschlagen, bei welchem insbesondere für die Herstellung des Behälters weniger Fügeschritte benötigt werden. Gelöst wird die Aufgabe dadurch, dass der Behälter (6) durch Innenhochdruckumformen eines einstückigen Hohlkörpers geformt wird, wobei die Stirnseitenbereiche (4a,4b) des Behälters beim Innenhochdruckumformen mitgeformt werden. Die Erfindung betrifft ferner die Verwendung eines nach dem Verfahren hergestellten Behälters (6) als Druckbehälter. Weiterhin betrifft die Erfindung einen Behälter (6) mit zwei Stirnseitenbereichen (4a,4b) und mit einem zwischen den Stirnseitenbereichen angeordneten Behältermantel (2).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/033 (2011.01); B21D 51/18 (2006.01); B21D 51/24 (2006.01); B21D 51/26 (2006.01); B21D 51/28 (2006.01); B65D 1/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B21D 26/033 (2013.01); B21D 51/18 (2013.01); B21D 51/24 (2013.01); B21D 51/2615 (2013.01); B21D 51/38 (2013.01); B65D 1/0207 (2013.01); B65D 88/06 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025426 A1 20090218; DE 102007038823 A1 20090219

INPADOC legal status


2013-08-14 [18R] REFUSED

- Effective date: 20130405

2012-12-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20121130

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090810

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS