Global Patent Index - EP 2025431 A1

EP 2025431 A1 2009-02-18 - Device for metal refining in the pony ladle

Title (en)

Device for metal refining in the pony ladle

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Metallverfeinerung im Zwischengefäß

Title (fr)

Dispositif d'affinage métallique dans la poche panière

Publication

EP 2025431 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08450090 A

Priority

EA 200702122 A

Abstract (en)

The invention relates to ferrous metallurgy, in particular to devices for steel refining by rare gas in a pony ladle. The device for metal refining in the pony ladle containing tuyere placed axially to a flow of effluent metal and done in such a way as to allow creation of rare gas bubbles flow is directed to guarantee maximum outlet of inclusions to refinery slag. For the purpose of resisting whirl metal movement occurring above nonswirl nozzle the inner surface of the receiving cone of the device is configured in the form of rectangular prism converting to truncated cone and creation of rare gas bubbles flow is provided by a porous refractory insert placed in the body of tuyere in such a way that the form thereof in cross section duplicates the form of the inner surface of the receiving cone.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22D 1/00 (2006.01); B22D 41/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22D 1/005 (2013.01); B22D 41/08 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EA 200501284 A 20050912

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025431 A1 20090218; EA 011370 B1 20090227; EA 200702122 A1 20090227

INPADOC legal status


2015-06-03 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20141231

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20090818

- Countries: AL

2009-10-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20090818

- Countries: BA

2009-10-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20090818

- Countries: MK

2009-10-21 [AXX] PAYMENT OF EXTENSION FEES

- Payment date: 20090818

- Countries: RS

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090915

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090812

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS