Global Patent Index - EP 2025463 A2

EP 2025463 A2 2009-02-18 - Cup attaching apparatus

Title (en)

Cup attaching apparatus

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zum Befestigen von Saugnäpfen

Title (fr)

Appareil de fixation de tasses

Publication

EP 2025463 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08021080 A

Priority

  • EP 07006719 A
  • JP 2006101283 A

Abstract (en)

A cup attaching apparatus (1) for attaching a cup (CU) to an eyeglass lens (LE), comprise: a cup holder (320) in which the cup is mounted; a blocking arm (310; 350a, 350b) having a central axis (S2; S2, S3) and being provided with the holder; and an arm rotating mechanism (324, 330, 332, 334; 352, 353, 354, 356, 358, 360, 362) for rotating the arm about the central axis to change an orientation of the holder.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B24B 13/005 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B24B 13/0055 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

JP 2002292547 A 20021008 - NIDEK KK

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

EPO simple patent family

EP 1839810 A1 20071003; EP 1839810 B1 20081210; DE 602007000333 D1 20090122; DE 602007008090 D1 20100909; DE 602007008091 D1 20100909; EP 2025462 A2 20090218; EP 2025462 A3 20090527; EP 2025462 B1 20100728; EP 2025463 A2 20090218; EP 2025463 A3 20090527; EP 2025463 B1 20100728; ES 2319578 T3 20090508; ES 2349070 T3 20101222; ES 2349286 T3 20101229; JP 2007268700 A 20071018; KR 101381121 B1 20140404; KR 20070098554 A 20071005

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180320

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-02-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170213

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-02-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160330

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160330

2016-02-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150325

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150212

- Year of fee payment: 9

2011-08-25 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007008091

- Effective date: 20110429

2011-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110429

2010-12-29 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Effective date: 20101216

2010-09-09 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602007008091 P 20100909

2010-07-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1839810 P

2010-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2010-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2010-02-03 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2010-01-06 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20091126

2009-05-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2009-02-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1839810 P

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB