Global Patent Index - EP 2025514 A2

EP 2025514 A2 2009-02-18 - Method and device for applying functional elements

Title (en)

Method and device for applying functional elements

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zur Applikation von funktionalen Elementen

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif d'application d'éléments fonctionnels

Publication

EP 2025514 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08009318 A

Priority

DE 102007031058 A

Abstract (en)

The machine has an applicator for supplying a label on a printed sheet when the sheet is passed to printing units. The applicator has an adjustment unit that adjusts the applicator relative to position information in a printed image such that the label and the image are positioned together in correct position. The position of the label in a conveying direction is adjusted relative to the sheet. The label is attached with a radio frequency identification (RFID) transponder or holograms as protection for product counterfeiting, where the label is a component of a package. An independent claim is also included for a method for operating a device in a sheet-fed rotary printing press.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Verfahren zum Betrieb einer Vorrichtung in einer Bogenrotationsdruckmaschine mit mindestens einem Druckwerk, einem Veredelungswerk, und einer Zuführvorrichtung zur Zuführung eines Etiketts auf einen Druckbogen während des Druckdurchlaufs. Um die Zufuhr der Etiketten genauer durchführen zu können, soll die Lage des zugeführten Etiketts in Förderrichtung des Druckbogens (Y-Richtung) auf dem Druckbogen bestimmt werden, indem auf den Druckbogen aufgedruckte Messmarken durch einen der Zuführvorrichtung vorgeschalteten Geber ausgewertet werden. Aus der Auswertung wird ein Signal für die Zuführvorrichtung abgeleitet, um mittels dieser zugeordneter Stelleinrichtungen eine lagerichtige Positionierung des Etiketts relativ zum Druckbild zu erzielen.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/12 (2006.01); B41F 33/00 (2006.01); G03F 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41F 19/00 (2013.01); B41F 33/0081 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

DE 102007031058 A1 20090108; EP 2025514 A2 20090218

INPADOC legal status


2014-07-09 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20140603

2013-08-14 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH

2013-08-07 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MANROLAND SHEETFED GMBH

2013-05-08 [19W] RESUMPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS)

- Effective date: 20130701

2012-03-21 [19U] INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20120201

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS