Global Patent Index - EP 2025523 A1

EP 2025523 A1 2009-02-18 - Sheet processing apparatus

Title (en)

Sheet processing apparatus

Title (de)

Vorrichtung zur Blattverarbeitung

Title (fr)

Appareil de traitement des feuilles

Publication

EP 2025523 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08013330 A

Priority

  • JP 2007194896 A
  • JP 2008152774 A

Abstract (en)

There is provided a sheet processing apparatus 1 capable of preventing the roll sheet 3A cut by the cutter unit 8 from falling over to the sheet processing apparatus 1 and improving the conveyance capability of the roll sheet 3A when the long size roll sheet 3A is made. Long size roll sheet 3A is fixed at three spots, wherein the three spots are the top edge portion 64A of the roll sheet receiving portion 64, the top edge portion 62D on the downstream side of the regulatory member 62, and the bottom edge portion 61A of the projecting portion 61. The bottom edge portion 61A of the projecting portion 61 is constructed to be always located inside a circular arc which starts from a center O with a maximum radius R of the roll sheet 3A, wherein the circular arc passes the top edge portion 64A of the roll sheet receiving portion 64 and the top edge portion 62D on the downstream side of the regulatory member 62.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41J 13/10 (2006.01); B41J 3/407 (2006.01); B41J 15/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B41J 13/106 (2013.01); B41J 3/4075 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025523 A1 20090218; EP 2025523 B1 20141022

INPADOC legal status


2018-06-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170726

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-09-29 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20141022

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170621

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2016-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2015-09-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20150723

2015-07-23 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602008034967

2014-12-04 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602008034967

- Effective date: 20141204

2014-10-22 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2014-10-22 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2014-06-11 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140513

2013-10-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41J 3/407 20060101ALI20130926BHEP

2013-10-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41J 15/04 20060101ALI20130926BHEP

2013-10-30 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B41J 13/10 20060101AFI20130926BHEP

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE DE FR GB

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090811

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS