Global Patent Index - EP 2025541 A1

EP 2025541 A1 2009-02-18 - Heating element of an electric heating device

Title (en)

Heating element of an electric heating device

Title (de)

Wärmeerzeugendes Element einer elektrischen Heizvorrichtung

Title (fr)

Elément d'un dispositif de chauffage produisant de la chaleur électrique

Publication

EP 2025541 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08015712 A

Priority

EP 07014118 A

Abstract (en)

The element (10) has a positional frame (28) made of an insulating material. The insulating material forms receptacles for a positive temperature coefficient (PTC) heating element. The receptacles are arranged between conductor paths (34, 36). The frame has retaining bars (40) that surround and limit the conductor paths, where the bars externally overlap the conductor paths. The bars are integrally molded to the positional frame as a single-piece using an injection molding and are plastically deformed in an overlapping manner after fitting the conductor paths on the positional frame.

Abstract (de)

Die vorliegende Erfindung betrifft ein wärmeerzeugendes Element einer elektrischen Heizvorrichtung umfassend einen Positionsrahmen (28) aus einem isolierenden Material, welcher nebeneinander liegende Aufnahmen (32) für jeweils wenigstens ein PTC-Heizelement (30) ausbildet, die zwischen Leiterbahnen (34, 36) angeordnet sind, an denen die PTC-Heizelemente (30) elektrisch leitend anliegen. Ein die Montage der elektrischen Heizvorrichtung erleichterndes wärmeerzeugendes Element nach der vorliegenden Erfindung weist einen Positionsrahmen auf, der die Leiterbahnen umgebende und begrenzende Haltestege umfasst, die Leiterbahnen außenseitig übergreifen.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B60H 1/22 (2006.01); F24H 3/04 (2006.01); F24H 9/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F24H 3/0405 (2013.01); F24H 3/0429 (2013.01); F24H 3/0435 (2013.01); F24H 3/0441 (2013.01); F24H 3/0447 (2013.01); F24H 3/0464 (2013.01); F24H 3/0476 (2013.01); F24H 9/1863 (2013.01); F24H 9/1872 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

EP 1564503 A1 20050817 - CATEM GMBH & CO KG [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2017103 A1 20090121; EP 2017103 B1 20160504; CN 101348067 A 20090121; CN 101348067 B 20110323; EP 2025541 A1 20090218; EP 2025541 B1 20130102; JP 2009043716 A 20090226; JP 4939490 B2 20120523; KR 100960748 B1 20100601; KR 20090009138 A 20090122; US 2009026194 A1 20090129; US 8362406 B2 20130129

INPADOC legal status


2018-07-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170720

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170724

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170721

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-07-20 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-07-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-08-12 [R26] OPPOSITION FILED (CORRECTION)

- Opponent name: MAHLE BEHR GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20130927

2014-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130718

2014-03-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20130718

2013-12-24 [REG DE R026] OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST PATENT

- Document: DE 502007011164

- Effective date: 20130927

2013-11-06 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: BEHR GMBH & CO. KG

- Effective date: 20130927

2013-07-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20130413

2013-02-28 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007011164

- Effective date: 20130228

2013-01-02 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 2017103 P

2013-01-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2013-01-02 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2009-07-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090622

2009-05-13 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: EBERSPAECHER CATEM GMBH & CO. KG

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081218

2009-02-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 2017103 P

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS