Global Patent Index - EP 2025593 A2

EP 2025593 A2 2009-02-18 - Rudder for ships

Title (en)

Rudder for ships

Title (de)

Ruder für Schiffe

Title (fr)

Gouvernail pour bateaux

Publication

EP 2025593 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08015619 A

Priority

  • EP 04740144 A
  • DE 202004006453 U

Abstract (en)

The ship's rudder assembly has a rudder blade (100) together with a propeller on a powered propeller shaft. The rudder blade is divided into two sections (10,20), over each other, with offset leading edges (11,21) towards the propeller. The leading edge of one section is offset to port or starboard, and the other leading edge is offset towards starboard or port. The two side walls (100a,100b) of the rudder come together at a common edge (30) at the side away from the propeller.

Abstract (de)

Das Ruder für Schiffe besteht aus einem Ruderblatt (100) und einem dem Ruder zugeordneten, auf einer antreibbaren Propellerachse angeordneten Propeller, wobei das Ruderblatt (100) zwei übereinander liegende Ruderblattabschnitte (10, 20) aufweist, deren dem Propeller zugekehrten vorderen Nasenleisten (11, 21) derart versetzt sind, dass die eine Nasenleiste (11) nach Backbord (BB) oder Steuerbord (SB) und die andere Nasenleiste (21) nach Steuerbord (SB) oder Backbord (BB) versetzt sind, wobei die beiden Seitenwandflächen des Ruderblattes (100) in eine dem Propeller abgewandte Endleiste (30) zusammenlaufen, wobei an das Ruderblatt (100) im Bereich der für den oberen Ruderblattabschnitt (10) und den unteren Ruderblattabschnitt (20) gemeinsamen Endleiste (30) eine Flosse (135) angelenkt ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B63H 25/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B63H 25/38 (2013.01); B63H 2025/388 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 8708276 U1 19870827

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

EPO simple patent family

DE 202004006453 U1 20041111; AT 431285 T 20090515; CN 100351143 C 20071128; CN 101016082 A 20070815; CN 101016082 B 20101208; CN 1689912 A 20051102; DE 202004021218 U1 20070419; DE 202004021222 U1 20070426; DE 202004021223 U1 20070419; DE 202004021474 U1 20080410; DE 202004021495 U1 20080605; DE 202004021604 U1 20090528; DE 502004009484 D1 20090625; DK 1626897 T3 20090713; DK 1857358 T3 20170102; EP 1626897 A1 20060222; EP 1626897 B1 20090513; EP 1857358 A2 20071121; EP 1857358 A3 20071205; EP 1857358 B1 20160907; EP 2025593 A2 20090218; EP 2025593 A3 20090401; EP 2025593 B1 20160817; ES 2323784 T3 20090724; ES 2602562 T3 20170221; ES 2604756 T3 20170309; HK 1083813 A1 20080808; JP 2005306355 A 20051104; JP 2007131298 A 20070531; JP 4410656 B2 20100203; JP 4597146 B2 20101215; KR 20050103137 A 20051027; KR 20090029249 A 20090320; PL 1857358 T3 20170228; PT 1626897 E 20090616; SI 1626897 T1 20090831; TW 200535049 A 20051101; TW 200734244 A 20070916; TW I295982 B 20080421; TW I302894 B 20081111; WO 2005113332 A1 20051201

INPADOC legal status


2018-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-08-31 [PGFP RO] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Payment date: 20180612

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20180625

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-08-31 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20180625

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-08-31 [PGFP TR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: TR

- Payment date: 20180608

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-08-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 820778 T

- Effective date: 20170622

2018-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180620

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-07-31 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Payment date: 20180620

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20180625

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-06-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 15

2018-06-25 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: BECKER MARINE SYSTEMS GMBH, DE

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: BECKER MARINE SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG, 21079 HAMBURG, DE

- Document: DE 502004015281

2018-06-25 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 502004015281

- Representative's name: RGTH RICHTER GERBAULET THIELEMANN HOFMANN PATE, DE

2018-04-30 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-04-30 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170622

2018-04-30 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170622

2018-04-30 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20170630

2018-03-21 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2018-01-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160817

2018-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2017-10-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20170703

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-08-31 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160817

2017-08-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170622

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170626

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-07-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20170518

2017-06-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 14

2017-05-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160817

2017-05-31 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160817

2017-05-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160817

2017-05-31 [PG25 BG] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BG

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161117

2017-05-18 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502004015281

2017-04-28 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160817

2017-04-12 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20160402868

- Effective date: 20170222

2017-04-05 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: BECKER MARINE SYSTEMS GMBH

2017-02-28 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20161219

2017-02-28 [PG25 PL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160817

2017-02-21 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2602562 T3

- Effective date: 20170221

2016-11-22 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2016-11-16 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2016-11-09 [REG RO EPE] EP PATENT VALID IN ROMANIA

2016-09-29 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502004015281

2016-09-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 820778 T

- Effective date: 20160915

2016-09-07 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: LANGUAGE OF EP DOCUMENT: GERMAN

2016-08-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2016-08-17 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1626897 P

2016-08-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2016-08-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2016-03-09 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20160208

2016-03-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR CHANGED BEFORE GRANT

- Inventor name: LEHMANN, DIRK

2014-09-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BECKER MARINE SYSTEMS GMBH & CO. KG

2009-11-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20091009

2009-04-01 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20080927

2009-02-18 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 1626897 P

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IT LI LU MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR