Global Patent Index - EP 2025606 A2

EP 2025606 A2 2009-02-18 - Container with a push button flip top

Title (en)

Container with a push button flip top

Title (de)

Behälter mit einem Druckknopf-Flip-Top

Title (fr)

Récipient avec un couvercle articulé muni d'un bouton poussoir

Publication

EP 2025606 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08162482 A

Priority

US 84065107 A

Abstract (en)

A container or container unit (10) includes a main container (12) having a rigid rim (22) and a flip top (14) for the main container. The flip top includes a base member (24) attached to the rigid rim and a cover member (26) hingedly connected to the base member and which has a first catch member (74). The base member includes a resilient push button (66) formed therewith. This push button includes a second catch member (70) such that the second catch member interacts with the first catch member when the cover member s in a closed position relative to the base member to hold the cover member to the base member, and such that the first and second catch member are separable from one another when the push button is pushed. The container unit includes a dry beverage mix in the first container and a dry additive (32) for the dry beverage mix in a secondary container (30) attached to an inside surface (34) of the cover member.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 3/14 (2006.01); B65D 47/08 (2006.01); B65D 51/20 (2006.01); B65D 51/28 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 47/0828 (2013.01); B65D 15/04 (2013.01); B65D 43/163 (2013.01); B65D 51/20 (2013.01); B65D 51/28 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0021 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0025 (2013.01); B65D 2251/0093 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00296 (2013.01); B65D 2543/00435 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

US 2008083758 A1 20080410; BR PI0803407 A2 20091208; CA 2638632 A1 20090217; CA 2872988 A1 20090217; CN 101481030 A 20090715; CN 101481030 B 20130102; EP 2025606 A2 20090218; EP 2025606 A3 20090325; EP 2025606 B1 20151007; EP 2402256 A1 20120104; ES 2557877 T3 20160129; HK 1135948 A1 20130927; IL 193424 A 20140731; IL 215295 D0 20111130; JP 2009078864 A 20090416; JP 2014094783 A 20140522; JP 5537785 B2 20140702; JP 5926235 B2 20160525; KR 101560826 B1 20151015; KR 101560987 B1 20151015; KR 20090018588 A 20090220; KR 20140135924 A 20141127; RU 2008133647 A 20100220; RU 2012156135 A 20140627; RU 2483011 C2 20130527; TW 200914330 A 20090401; TW I534050 B 20160521; UA 98759 C2 20120625

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-31 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160815

2017-07-31 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160815

2017-05-31 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2017-04-14 [REG FR TP] TRANSMISSION OF PROPERTY

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE DOUWE EGBERTS B.V., NL

- Effective date: 20170315

2017-03-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151007

2017-02-15 [REG CH PK] CORRECTION

- Free text: BERICHTIGUNG INHABER

2017-02-15 [REG CH PUE] ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: KONINKLIIJKE DOUWE EGBERTS B.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INTERCONTINENTAL GREAT BRANDS LLC, US

2017-02-01 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20170105 AND 20170111

2016-12-30 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151007

2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-12-01 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE DOUWE EGBERTS B.V.

- Effective date: 20161125

2016-11-30 [PG25 SI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151007

2016-11-30 [PGFP PL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PL

- Payment date: 20160719

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160825

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-11-07 [REG NL PD] CHANGE OF OWNERSHIP

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE DOUWE EGBERTS B.V.; NL

- Free text: DETAILS ASSIGNMENT: VERANDERING VAN EIGENAAR(S), OVERDRACHT; FORMER OWNER NAME: INTERCONTINENTAL GREAT BRANDS LLC

- Effective date: 20161004

2016-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20160824

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20160830

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20160829

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-09-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20160826

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-09-14 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20160708

2016-08-31 [PG25 RO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: RO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151007

2016-08-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151007

2016-08-31 [PG25 EE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: EE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151007

2016-08-31 [PG25 SK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151007

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 9

2016-07-29 [PG25 CZ] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CZ

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151007

2016-07-29 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: KONINKLIJKE DOUWE EGBERTS B.V., NL

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: INTERCONTINENTAL GREAT BRANDS LLC, EAST HANOVER, N.J., US

- Document: DE 602008040495

2016-07-08 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602008040495

2016-05-31 [PG25 LV] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LV

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151007

2016-05-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160208

2016-05-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160108

2016-05-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151007

2016-05-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151007

2016-04-29 [PG25 NO] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NO

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160107

2016-04-29 [PG25 IS] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IS

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20160207

2016-04-29 [PG25 LT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151007

2016-04-29 [PG25 HR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: HR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20151007

2016-03-02 [REG NL FP] TRANSLATION FOR EP FILED (ENTRY OF EP INTO COUNTRY)

2016-02-25 [REG LT MG4D] INVALIDATED EUROPEAN PATENT

2016-02-15 [REG AT MK05] REVOCATION OF THE TRANSLATION OF THE EP PATENT

- Document: AT 753580 T

- Effective date: 20151007

2016-01-29 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2557877 T3

- Effective date: 20160129

2016-01-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2015-11-19 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602008040495

2015-11-04 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2015-10-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2015-10-15 [REG AT REF] REFERENCE TO AT NUMBER (EP PATENT ENTERS AUSTRIAN NATIONAL PHASE)

- Document: AT 753580 T

- Effective date: 20151015

2015-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2015-10-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2015-05-20 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150424

2013-12-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: INTERCONTINENTAL GREAT BRANDS LLC

2009-12-02 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-11-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090929

2009-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090807

2009-04-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: KRAFT FOODS GLOBAL BRANDS LLC

2009-03-25 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-03-25 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS