Global Patent Index - EP 2025608 A2

EP 2025608 A2 2009-02-18 - Carton and blank therefor

Title (en)

Carton and blank therefor

Title (de)

Karton und Zuschnitt dafür

Title (fr)

Carton et ébauche correspondante

Publication

EP 2025608 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08162444 A

Priority

GB 0715901 A

Abstract (en)

A carton for receiving articles (A), the carton comprising first (3, 4) and second (6, 7)side walls, a top wall (8) and a bottom wall (5) hingedly connected together to form a tubular structure and an insert (10) associated with the tubular structure, at least one of the walls comprising a pair of inner (9) and outer (8) panels in overlying relationship to form a pocket therebetween, the insert being received in the pocket for sliding movement with respect to the tubular structure.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/42 (2006.01); B65D 71/20 (2006.01); B65D 71/38 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/4237 (2013.01); B65D 71/14 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00141 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00277 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00567 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00592 (2013.01); B65D 2571/0066 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00716 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00827 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025608 A2 20090218; EP 2025608 A3 20090415; GB 0715901 D0 20070926; RU 2008133653 A 20100220

INPADOC legal status


2010-07-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20100122

2009-12-23 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090911

2009-09-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090811

2009-04-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-04-15 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS