Global Patent Index - EP 2025609 A2

EP 2025609 A2 2009-02-18 - Carton, blanks for forming a carton, package and method of dispensing articles from a carton

Title (en)

Carton, blanks for forming a carton, package and method of dispensing articles from a carton

Title (de)

Karton, Zuschnitte für einen Karton, Verpackung und Verfahren zur Entnahme von Produkten aus einem Karton

Title (fr)

Carton, ébauches pour former un carton, emballage et procédé pour la distribution de produits d'un carton

Publication

EP 2025609 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08162446 A

Priority

GB 0715900 A

Abstract (en)

A carton for containing a plurality of articles (92,220), the carton comprising a vertical dispensing structure (51,206) for dispensing one or more articles (92,220) through an upper aperture.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/54 (2006.01); B65D 5/66 (2006.01); B65D 5/72 (2006.01); B65D 83/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 5/724 (2013.01); B65D 5/541 (2013.01); B65D 5/6602 (2013.01); B65D 83/005 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025609 A2 20090218; EP 2025609 A3 20090513; GB 0715900 D0 20070926; RU 2008133650 A 20100220

INPADOC legal status


2012-04-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20111115

2011-04-20 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS, LLC

2010-06-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2010-01-20 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-11-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090820

2009-10-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090918

2009-05-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-05-13 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS