Global Patent Index - EP 2025616 A1

EP 2025616 A1 2009-02-18 - Carton and blank therefor

Title (en)

Carton and blank therefor

Title (de)

Karton und Zuschnitt dafür

Title (fr)

Carton et ébauche correspondante

Publication

EP 2025616 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 08162443 A

Priority

GB 0715888 A

Abstract (en)

A carton (1) for receiving one or more primary articles (10) and one or more secondary articles (9), the carton comprising a plurality of outer panels (2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7, 8) hingedly connected together to form a tubular structure and a plurality of inner panels disposed substantially inside the tubular structure, the outer panels including a first outer panel (5) and second (4) and third (6) outer panels hingedly connected respectively to the opposed side edges of the first outer panel, the inner panels including a first inner panel (54a,54b) and second (44a, 44b) and third (64a, 64b) inner panels hingedly connected to opposed side edges of the first inner panel, wherein the first inner panel is hingedly connected to the first outer panel and folded into the tubular structure to take a partitioning position where the first inner panel at least partially partitions an internal space of the tubular structure into two compartments for receiving primary and secondary articles respectively and wherein the second and third inner panels are disposed in face-contacting relationship with the second and third outer panels respectively to anchor the first inner panel at the partitioning position.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 71/14 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00185 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00271 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00277 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00302 (2013.01); B65D 2571/0066 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00716 (2013.01); B65D 2571/0087 (2013.01); B65D 2571/00925 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

DE 2951351 A1 19810625 - 4 P VERPACKUNGEN GMBH [DE]

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025616 A1 20090218; GB 0715888 D0 20070926; RU 2008133649 A 20100220

INPADOC legal status


2011-06-22 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110106

2010-06-23 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MEADWESTVACO PACKAGING SYSTEMS LLC

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-06-24 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090525

2009-06-03 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090417

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS