Global Patent Index - EP 2025619 A1

EP 2025619 A1 2009-02-18 - Packaging

Title (en)

Packaging

Title (de)

Verpackung

Title (fr)

Emballage

Publication

EP 2025619 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08011575 A

Priority

DE 102007038107 A

Abstract (en)

The package has a member provided with longitudinal side parts (3a, 3b) and front side parts (4a, 4b). The longitudinal side parts and front side parts are joined together to form a resilient frame which is notched towards an inside part. The member is provided with pressure fingers which are disposed on the longitudinal side parts and front side parts. Another member is formed substantially identical to the former member. A casing exerts pressure on two-sided large surfaces object in a resilient and shock-absorbing fashion when the object is supported on contact surfaces of the two members.

Abstract (de)

Verpackung für flache quaderförmige Gegenstände, zum Beispiel Laptops oder Notebooks, dadurch gekennzeichnet , dass die Verpackung durch zwei im Wesentlichen gleiche, jedoch zueinander sowohl um eine vertikale sowie um eine horizontale Achse um 180° verdreht zusammengesetzte Verpackungsrahmenteile (1) gebildet wird, deren Längsseiten (3a,3b) und Stirnseiten (4a,4b) zum Innern hin federnd einbuchtend ausgebildet sind, und den eingesetzten Gegenstand stoßdämpfend umgeben.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/107 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 81/1075 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025619 A1 20090218; DE 102007038107 A1 20090212; US 2009032422 A1 20090205

INPADOC legal status


2010-06-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091202

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-08-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090722

2009-08-05 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090624

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Countries: AL BA MK RS