Global Patent Index - EP 2025636 A2

EP 2025636 A2 2009-02-18 - A lifting device for cellulose units

Title (en)

A lifting device for cellulose units

Title (de)

Hebevorrichtung für Celluloseeinheiten

Title (fr)

Dispositif de levage pour unités de cellulose

Publication

EP 2025636 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 08396012 A

Priority

FI 20070591 A

Abstract (en)

Lifting device for goods, like pulp units (7) which are bound with a binding device (8), comprising at least one horizontal beam (1) which is attached to a crane to which horizontal beam several claw boxes (2) which are moveable in the direction of the beam are attached where each claw box (2) grips a binding device (8) when gripping elements (9,10) of the claw boxes are brought closer to each other. A moveable two-piece transfer bar (20) for the claw boxes (2) is arranged near the horizontal beam (1) which allows claw boxes to be moved in the direction of the horizontal beam (1) in relation to other claw boxes (2) and where end plates (6) belong to the outermost claw boxes (2a,2b) of the horizontal beam, the distance between which can be reduced with the help of the transfer bar (20).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/28 (2006.01); B66C 1/44 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 1/447 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

US 3587889 A 19710628 - BOHLIN KARL GUNNAR, et al

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025636 A2 20090218; EP 2025636 A3 20120418; FI 120031 B 20090615; FI 20070591 A0 20070807; FI 20070591 A 20090208

INPADOC legal status


2015-05-20 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20141118

2014-08-06 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20140707

2013-03-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20130220

2013-02-27 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20121026

2013-02-27 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2013-02-21 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-01-02 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2012-12-26 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2012-04-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-04-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2012-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66C 1/28 20060101AFI20120314BHEP

2012-04-18 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: B66C 1/44 20060101ALI20120314BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS