Global Patent Index - EP 2025637 A1

EP 2025637 A1 2009-02-18 - Method and device to facilitate weathervaning a tower crane in a disturbed wind

Title (en)

Method and device to facilitate weathervaning a tower crane in a disturbed wind

Title (de)

Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum leichteren Einstellen der freien Drehfunktion eines Turmkrans bei starkem Wind

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour faciliter la mise en girouette d'une grue à tour dans un vent perturbé

Publication

EP 2025637 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 08356064 A

Priority

FR 0705817 A

Abstract (en)

The method involves exerting braking torque on a rotating part (2) of a tower crane when the tower crane is out of service. The braking torque is calculated from an expression Cfr2=Cfl2-Ccf2-Ccou, where Cfr2 represents the braking torque, Cfl2 represents the torque applied to an arrow (3) by wind with speed lower than maximum speed that is authorized for working of the crane, Ccf represents the torque applied to a camber (4) by the wind with speed lower than the maximum speed, and Ccou represents friction torque of an orientation crown (5) of the rotating part. An independent claim is also included for a device for assisting tower crane in a disturbed wind.

Abstract (fr)

La grue comprend une partie tournante (2) composée d'une flèche (3) et d'une contreflèche (4), et un mécanisme de rotation de la partie tournante (2) incluant au moins un motoréducteur avec un frein désactivé lorsque la grue est mise hors service, pour permettre la libre orientation de la partie tournante (2) selon la direction du vent (V). Lorsque la grue est mise hors service, il est exercé sur sa partie tournante (2) un couple de freinage (Cfr 2 ) : Formule dans laquelle : Cfl 2 représente le couple appliqué à la flèche (3) par un vent de vitesse V2 inférieure à la vitesse maximale autorisée pour le travail de la grue ; Ccf 2 représente le couple appliqué à la contreflèche (4) par le même vent de vitesse V2 ; Ccou représente le couple de frottement de la couronne d'orientation (5) de la partie tournante (2). Le couple de freinage (Cfr 2 ) peut être exercé par un frein additionnel associé à un motoréducteur d'orientation de la partie tournante (2).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66C 15/00 (2006.01); B66C 23/94 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66C 15/00 (2013.01); B66C 23/26 (2013.01); B66C 23/88 (2013.01); B66C 23/94 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

FR 2135689 A5 19721222 - POTAIN SA

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB IT

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025637 A1 20090218; EP 2025637 B1 20100526; DE 602008001337 D1 20100708; FR 2919853 A1 20090213; FR 2919853 B1 20090918

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 10

2017-07-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20170419

- Year of fee payment: 10

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140424

2013-10-31 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20100906

2013-08-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130422

- Year of fee payment: 6

2012-12-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20120425

- Year of fee payment: 5

2011-06-16 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602008001337

- Effective date: 20110228

2011-05-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20110301

2010-07-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 602008001337 P 20100708

2010-05-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2010-05-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB IT

2009-09-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090814

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS