Global Patent Index - EP 2025783 A1

EP 2025783 A1 2009-02-18 - Weft thread monitoring in the thread clamp of a loom

Title (en)

Weft thread monitoring in the thread clamp of a loom

Title (de)

Schussfadenüberwachung an der Fadenklemme in einer Webmaschine

Title (fr)

Surveillance de fils de trame sur le pince-fil dans une machine à tisser

Publication

EP 2025783 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 07016066 A

Priority

EP 07016066 A

Abstract (en)

The weaving machine has a stationary weft thread monitoring device arranged lateral to a weaving product (6) for detecting the arrival of a weft thread (5). A stationary thread trapper (10) is arranged at a beat-up (7) of the product, which has two arms pressed against each other for temporary holding of weft threads. The weft thread monitoring device has a sensor arranged on the thread trapper, by which a weft thread coming in the thread trapper is detected. An independent claim is included for a method for weft thread monitoring in a weaving machine.

Abstract (de)

An einer Webmaschine ist im Bereich des Anschlags (7) mindestens eine stationäre Fadenklemme (10) angeordnet, welche dazu dient, den Schussfaden festzuhalten. Zur Überwachung des Schussfadens ist an der Fadenklemme (10) ein triboelektrischer Sensor vorgesehen, mit welchem ein Spannungspuls erzeugt wird, wenn der Schussfaden in die Fadenklemme (10) eingeführt wird. Fehlt dieser Spannungspuls zu einer gegebenen Sollzeit, so kann auf einen fehlerhaften Betrieb geschlossen werden. Die beschriebene Messung findet zu einem sehr späten Zeitpunkt im Maschinenzyklus statt und erlaubt somit die Detektion auch sehr später Schussfadenfehler.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D03D 51/34 (2006.01); D03D 47/40 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D03D 51/34 (2013.01); D03D 47/40 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

None

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR IT LI SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025783 A1 20090218; EP 2025783 B1 20130612

INPADOC legal status


2017-11-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170817

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-11-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170831

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170829

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170821

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-10-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20170817

- Year of fee payment: 11

2017-08-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2016-08-25 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-06-26 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 502007011885

- Effective date: 20140313

2014-05-21 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20140313

2013-08-08 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 502007011885

- Effective date: 20130808

2013-07-02 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2013-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2013-06-14 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM AND CO. AG PATENT- UND MARKENANWAELTE , CH

2013-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI SE

2009-10-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090924

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR IT LI SE

2009-09-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090805

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS