Global Patent Index - EP 2025786 A1

EP 2025786 A1 2009-02-18 - Bar for a warp knitting machine

Title (en)

Bar for a warp knitting machine

Title (de)

Barre für eine Kettenwirkmaschine

Title (fr)

Barre pour un métier à tricoter à mailles jetées

Publication

EP 2025786 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 08002624 A

Priority

DE 102007038589 A

Abstract (en)

The bar (1) comprises a corpus (3), which is made of carbon fiber reinforced plastic material, and a needle receiver (6). The needle receiver is formed in a plastic coating. The plastic coating is formed from a plastic, which is adhered in non hardened condition. The needle receiver comprises slots, which is milled in the plastic coating. The needle receiver comprises parallel beads. The adhesive is used on polyurethane basis as plastic coating. An independent claim is included for a method for manufacturing a bar for a warp knitting machine.

Abstract (de)

Es wird eine Barre (1) für eine Kettenwirkmaschine angegeben mit einem Korpus (3), der kohlefaserverstärktes Kunststoffmaterial und eine Nadelaufnahme (6) aufweist. Man möchte eine derartige Barre einfach und kostengünstig fertigen können. Hierzu ist vorgesehen, dass die Nadelaufnahme (6) in einem Kunststoffauftrag (10) ausgebildet ist.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 27/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 27/06 (2013.01); D04B 27/24 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR IT LI

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025786 A1 20090218; CN 101368316 A 20090218; CN 101368316 B 20110803; DE 102007038589 A1 20090226; DE 102007038589 B4 20140220; KR 100972341 B1 20100726; KR 20090017965 A 20090219; TW 200912067 A 20090316; TW I357942 B 20120211

INPADOC legal status


2016-05-04 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20151110

2015-07-29 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150629

2015-07-22 [INTG] ANNOUNCEMENT OF INTENTION TO GRANT

- Effective date: 20150623

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR IT LI

2009-07-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090617

2009-07-01 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090519

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS