Global Patent Index - EP 2025787 A2

EP 2025787 A2 2009-02-18 - Crochet machine

Title (en)

Crochet machine

Title (de)

Häkelmaschine

Title (fr)

Machine à crocheter

Publication

EP 2025787 A2 (EN)

Application

EP 07425522 A

Priority

IT MI20071619 A

Abstract (en)

A crochet machine comprising weaving members (12) for manufacturing a textile product; at least one main bar (40); at least one weaving element (20) designed to obtain ornaments in said textile product; at least one actuator (30) mounted on said main bar (40) and uniquely dedicated to said weaving element (20), said actuator (30) being active on said weaving element (20) to move the latter along a direction transverse to a longitudinal extension of said main bar (40).

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D04B 27/32 (2006.01); D04B 25/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D04B 27/32 (2013.01); D04B 25/12 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025787 A2 20090218; EP 2025787 A3 20110803; CN 101358408 A 20090204; IT MI20071619 A1 20090204; TW 200932977 A 20090801

INPADOC legal status


2012-08-01 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20120204

2012-05-31 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20120411

2012-04-11 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2011-08-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2011-08-03 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS

2011-08-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D04B 27/32 20060101AFI20110628BHEP

2011-08-03 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D04B 25/12 20060101ALI20110628BHEP

2011-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D04B 27/32 20060101AFI20090114BHEP

2011-04-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D04B 25/12 20060101ALI20110309BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS