Global Patent Index - EP 2025793 A1

EP 2025793 A1 2009-02-18 - WASHING MACHINE

Title (en)

WASHING MACHINE

Title (de)

WASCHMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE À LAVER

Publication

EP 2025793 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07706907 A

Priority

  • JP 2007050600 W
  • JP 2006139284 A

Abstract (en)

A washing machine according to the present invention is configured such as to prevent intrusion of water into an ozone generator (42). That is, the washing machine is configured such that an introduction tube (43) extends downward from the ozone generator (42) to be connected to an air duct member (31). With this arrangement, even if water is condensed in the introduction tube (43) due to a temperature difference between the inside and the outside of the introduction tube (43), water droplets resulting from the water condensation do not intrude into the ozone generator (42), but fall down toward the air duct member (31) by their gravity. Further, even if water bubbles and detergent bubbles generated in an outer tub (7) during a washing process enter the introduction tube (43) and are broken to form water droplets, these water droplets, like the water drops resulting from the water condensation, do not intrude into the ozone generator (42), but fall down toward the air duct member (31) by their gravity. ( Fig. 6 )

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 17/12 (2006.01); D06F 25/00 (2006.01); D06F 39/00 (2006.01); D06F 39/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 39/008 (2013.01); D06F 35/001 (2013.01); D06F 39/08 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025793 A1 20090218; EP 2025793 A4 20100818; CN 101448995 A 20090603; CN 101448995 B 20110119; JP 2007307145 A 20071129; JP 4592640 B2 20101201; KR 20090026261 A 20090312; US 2009126420 A1 20090521; WO 2007135784 A1 20071129

INPADOC legal status


2011-02-16 [18W] APPLICATION WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110103

2010-08-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100719

2009-07-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2009-04-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081108

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS