Global Patent Index - EP 2025794 A1

EP 2025794 A1 2009-02-18 - WASHING MACHINE

Title (en)

WASHING MACHINE

Title (de)

WASCHMASCHINE

Title (fr)

MACHINE À LAVER

Publication

EP 2025794 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07706908 A

Priority

  • JP 2007050601 W
  • JP 2006145497 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention provides a washing machine configured such that a gas having a cleaning function is prevented from leaking to the outside. The washing machine performs an ozone cleaning step for cleaning dry laundry by supplying ozone to the laundry prior to a washing step. Before the start of the ozone cleaning step, a dehumidification water valve (14) is opened to once retain dehumidification water in a bottom of an outer tub (7). Then, water is retained in an overflow trap (45) by utilizing the dehumidification water, whereby a flow passage extending from the outer tub (7) to the outside is sealed with the water. Further, a detergent valve (55) or a finishing agent valve (56) is opened to retain water in a water supply trap (24), whereby a flow passage extending from the outer tub (7) to the outside is sealed with the water.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 17/12 (2006.01); D06F 25/00 (2006.01); D06F 33/02 (2006.01); D06F 35/00 (2006.01); D06F 39/00 (2006.01); D06F 39/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 25/00 (2013.01); D06F 35/001 (2013.01); D06F 39/08 (2013.01); D06F 39/083 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025794 A1 20090218; EP 2025794 A4 20100818; EP 2025794 B1 20120321; CN 101454497 A 20090610; ES 2383232 T3 20120619; JP 2007313006 A 20071206; JP 4637056 B2 20110223; US 2009260404 A1 20091022; WO 2007138757 A1 20071206

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20180103

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180117

- Year of fee payment: 12

2018-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20171211

- Year of fee payment: 12

2017-12-11 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 12

2016-12-15 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 11

2015-12-08 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 10

2014-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20130118

2014-06-11 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20140611

2013-04-18 [REG DE R097] NO OPPOSITION FILED AGAINST GRANTED PATENT, OR EPO OPPOSITION PROCEEDINGS CONCLUDED WITHOUT DECISION

- Document: DE 602007021435

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-03-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HAIER GROUP CORPORATION, CN

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD., OSAKA, JP

- Document: DE 602007021435

- Effective date: 20130117

2013-03-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: QINGDAO HAIER WASHING MACHINE CO. LTD., CN

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD., OSAKA, JP

- Document: DE 602007021435

- Effective date: 20130117

2013-03-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: HAIER GROUP CORPORATION, QINGDAO, CN

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD., OSAKA, JP

- Document: DE 602007021435

- Effective date: 20130117

2013-03-14 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: QINGDAO HAIER WASHING MACHINE CO. LTD., QINGDA, CN

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: SANYO ELECTRIC CO., LTD., OSAKA, JP

- Document: DE 602007021435

- Effective date: 20130117

2013-03-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007021435

- Representative's name: WITTE, WELLER & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20130117

2013-03-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 602007021435

- Representative's name: WITTE, WELLER & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20130117

2013-02-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20130102

2013-02-27 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20130131 AND 20130206

2012-06-19 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2383232 T3

- Effective date: 20120619

2012-05-16 [REG DE R096] DPMA PUBLICATION OF MENTIONED EP PATENT GRANT

- Document: DE 602007021435

- Effective date: 20120516

2012-03-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2012-03-21 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2011-06-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 17/12 20060101AFI20110502BHEP

2011-06-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 25/00 20060101ALI20110502BHEP

2011-06-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 33/02 20060101ALI20110502BHEP

2011-06-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 35/00 20060101ALI20110502BHEP

2011-06-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 39/00 20060101ALI20110502BHEP

2011-06-08 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 39/08 20060101ALI20110502BHEP

2010-08-18 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20100715

2010-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 17/12 20060101AFI20080218BHEP

2010-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 25/00 20060101ALI20100706BHEP

2010-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 33/02 20060101ALI20100706BHEP

2010-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 35/00 20060101ALI20100706BHEP

2010-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 39/00 20060101ALI20100706BHEP

2010-08-11 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D06F 39/08 20060101ALI20100706BHEP

2009-07-15 [DAX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT (TO ANY COUNTRY) (DELETED)

2009-07-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2009-04-15 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION)

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB

2009-02-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20081120

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS