Global Patent Index - EP 2025802 A2

EP 2025802 A2 2009-02-18 - Hybrid household drying device

Title (en)

Hybrid household drying device

Title (de)

Hybrides Hausgerät zum Trocknen

Title (fr)

Appareil ménager hybride de séchage

Publication

EP 2025802 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08104996 A

Priority

DE 102007038192 A

Abstract (en)

The appliance (1) has a treatment chamber (3) for accommodating articles (2) e.g. laundry, where processing air flow is guideable through the chamber by a processing air duct. Heat pump circuits e.g. evaporator (12) and liquefier (14) are integrated into the air duct. The liquefier liquefies working fluid under heating the processing air flow blowing against the chamber. A compressor (13) e.g. rotation compressor, of the air duct is provided for receiving power between 200 watts and 500 watts, and a heater is designed for a thermal power between 300 watts and 3500 watts.

Abstract (de)

Die Erfindung betrifft ein Hausgerät 1 zum Trocknen von Gegenständen 2, umfassend eine Behandlungskammer 3 zum Aufnehmen der Gegenstände 2 sowie einen Prozessluftkanal 4, durch welchen ein Prozessluftstrom durch die Behandlungskammer 3 führbar ist, und welcher ein Gebläse 5, einen Heizer 6 zum Aufheizen des Prozessluftstroms vor der Behandlungskammer 3, einen Luft-Luft-Wärmetauscher 7 und einen Wärmepumpenkreis 11, 12, 13, 14, 15aufweist. Dieser umfasst einen geschlossenen Arbeitsmittelkreislauf 11, in welchem ein Arbeitsmittel zirkulierbar ist und in welchem ein Verdampfer 12, ein Kompressor 13, ein Verflüssiger 14 und eine Drossel 15 angeordnet sind. Der Verdampfer 12 zum Verdampfen des Arbeitsmittels unter Abkühlen des von der Behandlungskammer 3 abgeströmten Prozessluftstroms und der Verflüssiger 14 zum Verflüssigen des Arbeitsmittels unter Aufheizen des die Behandlungskammer 3 anströmenden Prozessluftstroms sind in den Prozessluftkanal 4 integriert. Der Kompressor 13 ist zur Aufnahme einer Leistung zwischen 200 W und 500 W und der Heizer 6 für eine thermische Leistung zwischen 300 W und 3500 W ausgelegt. Das Hausgerät 1 ist insbesondere ein Wäschetrockner 1.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/20 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06F 58/206 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025802 A2 20090218; EP 2025802 A3 20091007; DE 102007038192 A1 20090219

INPADOC legal status


2015-12-30 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20150728

2015-03-25 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: BSH HAUSGERAETE GMBH

2010-06-16 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2010-06-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20100506

2010-05-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20100407

2009-10-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-10-07 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS