Global Patent Index - EP 2025807 A1

EP 2025807 A1 2009-02-18 - Method to recover chemicals in mechanical pulping

Title (en)

Method to recover chemicals in mechanical pulping

Title (de)

Verfahren zur Wiederherstellung von Chemikalien beim mechanischen Aufschluss

Title (fr)

Procédé de récupération de produits chimiques dans une mise en pâte mécanique

Publication

EP 2025807 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 07397025 A

Priority

EP 07397025 A

Abstract (en)

The present invention refers to a method to recover chemicals in mechanical pulping by evaporating mechanical pulping or recycled fibre plant effluent and burning the received concentrate under oxidative atmosphere to yield sodium carbonate. According to the invention said sodium carbonate is dissolved into water together with CaO in order to convert said sodium carbonate into sodium hydroxide at least partly.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21C 11/0064 (2013.01); D21C 9/10 (2013.01); D21C 11/10 (2013.01); D21C 11/122 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT SE

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA HR MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025807 A1 20090218; US 2009025892 A1 20090129

INPADOC legal status


2010-05-12 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20091106

2009-12-03 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

2009-10-21 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Designated State(s): AT SE

2009-07-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20090625

2009-07-08 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20090529

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA HR MK RS