Global Patent Index - EP 2025808 A2

EP 2025808 A2 2009-02-18 - Machine for producing a sheet of fibrous material

Title (en)

Machine for producing a sheet of fibrous material

Title (de)

Maschine zur Herstellung einer Faserstoffbahn

Title (fr)

Machine destinée à la fabrication d'une bande de matière fibreuse

Publication

EP 2025808 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 08161231 A

Priority

DE 102007036956 A

Abstract (en)

The machine has a flow box (12) with a flow box nozzle (28) that exhibits an exit slit for production of suspension radiation (38). A supplying unit (22) supplies and/or extracts respective presettable volume flow into and/or from two lateral boundary regions (24, 26) of nozzle area of the nozzle. An online-dilution water regulator and a shield influencing formation of cross and/or longitudinal profiles of a fibrous material web are provided over an appropriate exit slit transverse profile and/or an appropriate change of middle exit slit height.

Abstract (de)

Eine Maschine zur Herstellung einer Faserstoffbahn, insbesondere Papier- oder Kartonbahn, umfasst einen einen Suspensionsstrahl liefernden Stoffauflauf mit einer Stoffauflaufdüse, die zur Erzeugung des Suspensionsstrahls einen sich quer zur Bahnlaufrichtung erstreckenden Austrittsspalt besitzt, und eine Einrichtung zur Einspeisung und/oder zum Abziehen eines jeweiligen vorgebbaren Volumenstroms in bzw. aus den beiden seitlichen Randbereichen des Düsenraumes der Stoffauflaufdüse zur Beeinflussung des Faserorientierungsquerprofils der Faserstoffbahn. Dabei sind Mittel zur Beeinflussung des Formationsquer- und/oder - längsprofils der Faserstoffbahn über eine entsprechende Austrittsspaltquerprofilierung bzw. eine entsprechende Änderung der in Querrichtung betrachtet mittleren Austrittsspalthöhe vorgesehen, wobei das Formationsquer- bzw. -längsprofil und das Faserorientierungsquerprofil simultan und unabhängig voneinander beeinflussbar sind.

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/02 (2006.01); D21F 1/06 (2006.01); D21G 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D21F 1/022 (2013.01); D21F 1/024 (2013.01); D21F 1/028 (2013.01); D21F 1/06 (2013.01); D21G 9/0027 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

Designated extension state (EPC)

AL BA MK RS

EPO simple patent family

EP 2025808 A2 20090218; EP 2025808 A3 20121024; DE 102007036956 A1 20090205

INPADOC legal status


2013-10-23 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20130425

2013-08-22 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

- Effective date: 20130703

2013-07-03 [AKY] NO DESIGNATION FEES PAID

2013-07-03 [REG DE R108] DE NO LONGER DESIGNATED STATE

2012-10-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2012-10-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS

2012-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D21G 9/00 20060101ALI20120920BHEP

2012-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D21F 1/02 20060101AFI20120920BHEP

2012-10-24 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: D21F 1/06 20060101ALI20120920BHEP

2009-02-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL NO PL PT RO SE SI SK TR

2009-02-18 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO:

- Countries: AL BA MK RS